McQueen v. Delasamie et al
Plaintiff: Donna McQueen
Defendant: Davenport Trucking LLC and Brantley Delasamie
Case Number: 7:2020cv02859
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna McQueen. Amended Summons & Complaint Brantley Delasamie served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Proof of Service, #2 Supporting Documents Certified Card Executed, #3 Supporting Documents Amended Summons, #4 Supporting Documents SCDMV Proof of Service)(Dalzell, Elizabeth)
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss. Response filed by Donna McQueen. Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/17/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint)(Dalzell, Elizabeth) Modified on 9/10/2020: to add description to attachment; to remove duplicate text (exhibit exhibit) (kmca).
September 4, 2020 Filing 13 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 11 Reason: Filing attorney refiled to correct entry. Corrected Filing Document Number #12 Modified filing date to that of original filing: 09/03/2020 Response due date modified to that of original filing: n/a (abuc)
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donna McQueen. Brantley Delasamie served on 8/21/20, answer due 9/18/20. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Proof of Service, #2 Supporting Documents Executed Certified Card, #3 Supporting Documents Summons, #4 Supporting Documents SCDMV Proof of Service)(Dalzell, Elizabeth) Modified to correct date filed on 9/4/2020 (abuc). Modified on 9/8/2020: to add service and answer dates (kmca).
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 Amended Summons Issued as to Davenport Trucking LLC, Brantley Delasamie. (kmca)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Donna McQueen. Service due by 11/30/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Summons Amended, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Amended) (Dalzell, Elizabeth) Modified on 9/1/2020: to remove attachments-not filed in ECF(kmca).
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Davenport Trucking LLC.(Perlman, Tracey)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Davenport Trucking LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/10/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)No proposed order.(Perlman, Tracey) Modified on 8/27/2020: to remove duplicate text (memo in support) (kmca).
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey R Perlman on behalf of Davenport Trucking LLC (Perlman, Tracey)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Davenport Trucking LLC, Brantley Delasamie. (Attachments: #1 Summons Davenport Trucking LLC)(kmca)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Donna McQueen.(kmca)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Davenport Trucking LLC, Brantley Delasamie (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9262576), filed by Donna McQueen. Service due by 11/4/2020.(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McQueen v. Delasamie et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davenport Trucking LLC
Represented By: Tracey R Perlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brantley Delasamie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna McQueen
Represented By: Elizabeth M Dalzell
Represented By: Kenneth E Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?