Oates v. Dreamworks Animation
Plaintiff: Frances H Oates
Defendant: Dreamworks Animation
Case Number: 7:2020cv02895
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Filing 16 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 15 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Frances H Oates 213 Ellington Drive Spartanburg, SC 29301 (rweb, )
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, see order #12 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 9/23/20. (rweb, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #12 Order, #13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint, filed by Frances H Oates placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Frances H Oates 213 Ellington Drive Spartanburg, SC 29301 (rweb, )
September 23, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint, the undersigned recommends that the District Court dismiss this action without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 10/7/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 9/23/20. (rweb, )
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff. This case is subject to summary dismissal. Therefore, the Clerk of Court shall notissue the summons for service of process at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 9/23/20. (rweb, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT by Frances H Oates to #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(gpre, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Frances H Oates. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rweb, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Frances H Oates. Response to Motion due by 8/24/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) No proposed order. Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin. (rweb, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/11/2020: #2 Subrogated Interest in Claim) (rweb, ).
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dreamworks Animation, filed by Frances H Oates. Service due by 11/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Photographs, #2 Envelope) (rweb, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/11/2020) (rweb, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/11/2020: #3 Corrected Complaint, #4 Envelope) (rweb, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2020: #5 Supplement with signature page, #6 Cover Letter, #7 Envelope) (rweb, ). Supplement event #9 filed 9/8/2020 (gpre, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oates v. Dreamworks Animation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances H Oates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dreamworks Animation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?