Kennington v. CMH Homes Inc
Plaintiff: Nancy Kennington
Defendant: CMH Homes Inc doing business as Clayton Homes and Oakwood Homes
Case Number: 7:2020cv03003
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by CMH Homes Inc.(Custer, Clayton)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 3/8/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 9/16/20. (kmca)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/6/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/20/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 10/20/2020, ADR Statement/Certification due by 10/20/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/30/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/30/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/29/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/29/2021, Discovery due by 3/1/2021, Motions due by 3/15/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 6/7/2021 or sixty (60) days after dispositive motions have been resolved. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 9/16/20. (kmca)
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against CMH Homes Inc, filed by Nancy Kennington. Service due by 12/14/2020.(kmca) Re-filed by clerk to correct event. (kmca)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 Plaintiff's Answers to 26.01 Interogs Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Nancy Kennington.(Smith, Albert)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by CMH Homes Inc.(kmca)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by CMH Homes Inc.(kmca)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-42-01432. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-9288680), filed by CMH Homes Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 State Court Documents Exhibit B - Service of Complaint on CMH, #3 Exhibit C - Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Certificate of Service for Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit E - CMH Secretary of State Information, #6 Exhibit F - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennington v. CMH Homes Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMH Homes Inc doing business as Clayton Homes and Oakwood Homes
Represented By: Clayton M Custer
Represented By: Catherine Farrell Wrenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Kennington
Represented By: Albert V Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?