Wood Creek Properties of Landrum LLC v. Duke Energy Carolinas LLC et al
Plaintiff: Wood Creek Properties of Landrum LLC
Defendant: Duke Energy Carolinas LLC and Duke Energy Corporation
Case Number: 7:2020cv03249
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2020 Filing 19 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Wood Creek Properties of Landrum LLC.(Cash, Molly)
October 28, 2020 Filing 18 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 5/18/2021, Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 10/28/2020. (abuc)
October 28, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/10/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/12/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/9/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/9/2021, Discovery due by 5/11/2021, Motion in Limine due by 8/24/2021, Motions due by 5/25/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 8/6/2021, Pretrial Briefs due by 8/31/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 9/7/2021, Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 10/28/2020. (abuc)
October 27, 2020 Filing 16 Rule 26(f) Report by Wood Creek Properties of Landrum LLC.(Cash, Molly)
October 19, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Counterclaim #10 by Wood Creek Properties of Landrum LLC.(Brogdon, Beau) (Main Document 15 replaced with corrected document provided by filing user on 10/20/2020) (abuc).
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/27/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 11/10/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 11/10/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/21/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/20/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/19/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/19/2021, Discovery due by 3/22/2021, Motion in Limine due by 6/23/2021, Motions due by 4/5/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 6/7/2021, Pretrial Briefs due by 6/30/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 7/7/2021, Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 10/7/2020. (abuc) Modified to edit text on 10/8/2020 (abuc).
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 OPINION & ORDER denying #5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 10/7/2020.(abuc)
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Duke Energy Carolinas LLC, Duke Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Website Printouts)(Spencer, Joshua)
September 29, 2020 Filing 10 Amended ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Wood Creek Properties of Landrum LLC by Duke Energy Carolinas LLC, Duke Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Wood Creek Deed, #2 Exhibit B- ROW Agreement)(Spencer, Joshua)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Response filed by Wood Creek Properties of Landrum LLC.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/2/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Brogdon, Beau)
September 25, 2020 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Wood Creek Properties of Landrum LLC.(Brogdon, Beau)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Spartanburg County. (Attachments: #1 Acknowledgement of Removal)(Spencer, Joshua)
September 11, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff is directed to file their Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories no later than 9/25/2020. (abuc)
September 11, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Duke Energy Carolinas LLC, Duke Energy Corporation. Response to Motion due by 9/25/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Printouts Regarding Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC and Duke Energy Corporation, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Stephen C. Charney, #3 Certificate of Service)(abuc)
September 11, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Duke Energy Carolinas LLC, Duke Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(abuc)
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Duke Energy Carolinas LLC, Duke Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(abuc)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg reenville County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-cp-42-02711. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9336088), filed by Duke Energy Carolinas LLC, Duke Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Printouts Regarding Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC and Duke Energy Corporation, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Documents, #3 Certificate of Service)(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood Creek Properties of Landrum LLC v. Duke Energy Carolinas LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Energy Carolinas LLC
Represented By: Meghan Gregory Riordan
Represented By: Joshua D Spencer
Represented By: Sarah Spruill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Energy Corporation
Represented By: Meghan Gregory Riordan
Represented By: Joshua D Spencer
Represented By: Sarah Spruill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wood Creek Properties of Landrum LLC
Represented By: Molly Hubbard Cash
Represented By: Beau Bagnal Brogdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?