Parkins et al v. McMaster et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Thomas Parkins and Matt Parkins
Defendant: Henry Dargan McMaster, Michael Leach, Robert Kerr, Constance Holloway, South Carolina Department of Social Services, Edward Sexton, Tomekia Means, Calvin Hill, Jane Boe, John Boe, South Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, Joshua Baker, Althea Myers, Jane Doe, John Doe, South Carolina Department of Disabilities and Special Needs, Patrick Maley, Laurens County Disabiliities and Special Needs Board, Jan Stevens, John Poe, Jane Poe, Spartanburg Regional Medical Center, Union Medical Center, Paul Newhouse, MD Tonya Renee Washington, Jan Bradley, John Roe, Jane Roe and Laurens County Disabilities and Special Needs Board
Case Number: 7:2021cv02641
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12117
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2021 Filing 29 TEXT ORDER denying as moot #26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Entered at the direction of Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 10/6/21. (sfla)
October 6, 2021 Filing 27 OPINION and ORDER denying without prejudice #17 Motion to Dismiss, #23 Motion to Dismiss, #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #11 Motion to Dismiss, and #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff is instructed to file an amended complaint as set out which complies with Rule 8 FRCP and with Local Rule 1.05 in all respects within twenty (20) days of the date of this order. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 10/6/21. (sfla)
October 6, 2021 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #24 Response in Opposition to Motion, #25 Response in Opposition to Motion,, by Jan Bradley, Paul Newhouse, Spartanburg Regional Medical Center, Union Medical Center, Tonya Renee Washington. Response to Motion due by 10/20/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Thompson, Joshua)
October 1, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss or for a More Definite Statement, #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #11 MOTION to Dismiss or for more definite statement, #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Matt Parkins, Matthew Thomas Parkins.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/8/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Harrison, Patricia)
September 29, 2021 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Dismiss or for more definite statement of Defendant Calvin Hill Response filed by Matt Parkins, Matthew Thomas Parkins.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/6/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Harrison, Patricia)
September 15, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss or for more definite statement by Calvin Hill. Response to Motion due by 9/29/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Woodington, Kenneth)
September 2, 2021 Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #17 MOTION to Dismiss or for a More Definite Statement, #11 MOTION to Dismiss or for more definite statement, #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Response to Motion due by 10/1/2021. Entered at the direction of Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 9/2/21. (sfla)
September 1, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to ECFs 9, 10, 11 Motions to Dismiss by Matt Parkins, Matthew Thomas Parkins. Response to Motion due by 9/15/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Harrison, Patricia)
August 25, 2021 Filing 18 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Jan Bradley, Paul Newhouse, Spartanburg Regional Medical Center, Union Medical Center, Tonya Renee Washington.(Thompson, Joshua)
August 25, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss or for a More Definite Statement by Jan Bradley, Paul Newhouse, Spartanburg Regional Medical Center, Union Medical Center, Tonya Renee Washington. Response to Motion due by 9/8/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Thompson, Joshua)
August 23, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Henry Dargan McMaster. Response to Motion due by 9/7/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Woodington, Kenneth)
August 23, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by William Grayson Lambert on behalf of Henry Dargan McMaster (Lambert, William)
August 22, 2021 Filing 12 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Matt Parkins, Matthew Thomas Parkins.(Butcher, Robert)
August 20, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss or for more definite statement by Joshua Baker, Laurens County Disabilities and Special Needs Board, Tomekia Means, Althea Myers, South Carolina Department of Disabilities and Special Needs, South Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, South Carolina Department of Social Services. Response to Motion due by 9/3/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Woodington, Kenneth) Modified on 10/6/2021: to correct typo (Disabilities) (kmca).
August 20, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Patrick Maley. Response to Motion due by 9/3/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Woodington, Kenneth)
August 20, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Constance Holloway, Robert Kerr, Michael Leach. Response to Motion due by 9/3/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Woodington, Kenneth)
August 20, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER. New case number is 7-21-cv-2641-HMH. Please make a note of this for all future filings as well as Judge's preferences. (kmca)
August 20, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiffs' Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are due fourteen 14 days after removal. (kmca)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr. Judge Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr no longer assigned to the case. (glev, )
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Joshua Baker, Constance Holloway, Robert Kerr, Laurens County Disabiliities and Special Needs Board, Michael Leach, Patrick Maley, Henry Dargan McMaster, Tomekia Means, Althea Myers, South Carolina Department of Disabilities and Special Needs, South Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, South Carolina Department of Social Services.(mflo, )
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Union County Court of Common Pleas, case number 21-CP-44-125. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-10022531), filed by Michael Leach, Joshua Baker, Patrick Maley, Althea Myers, Constance Holloway, Tomekia Means, Laurens County Disabiliities and Special Needs Board, South Carolina Department of Disabilities and Special Needs, Robert Kerr, South Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, South Carolina Department of Social Services, Henry Dargan McMaster. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Affidavit William H Davidson, #3 Certificate of Service)(mflo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parkins et al v. McMaster et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Thomas Parkins
Represented By: Deborah J Butcher
Represented By: Patricia L Harrison
Represented By: Robert J Butcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Parkins
Represented By: Deborah J Butcher
Represented By: Patricia L Harrison
Represented By: Robert J Butcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Dargan McMaster
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Woodington
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Represented By: Thomas Ashley Limehouse, Jr
Represented By: William Grayson Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Leach
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Woodington
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Kerr
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Woodington
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constance Holloway
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Woodington
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Social Services
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Woodington
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomekia Means
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Woodington
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Hill
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Woodington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Boe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Boe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Woodington
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Baker
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Woodington
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Althea Myers
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Woodington
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South Carolina Department of Disabilities and Special Needs
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Woodington
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Maley
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Woodington
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurens County Disabiliities and Special Needs Board
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Woodington
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spartanburg Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Joshua Tate Thompson
Represented By: Perry D Boulier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Medical Center
Represented By: Joshua Tate Thompson
Represented By: Perry D Boulier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Newhouse
Represented By: Joshua Tate Thompson
Represented By: Perry D Boulier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Tonya Renee Washington
Represented By: Joshua Tate Thompson
Represented By: Perry D Boulier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Bradley
Represented By: Joshua Tate Thompson
Represented By: Perry D Boulier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurens County Disabilities and Special Needs Board
Represented By: Kenneth Paul Woodington
Represented By: William Henry Davidson, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?