Dooly v. Sears et al
Plaintiff: Geary Thomas Dooly
Defendant: Nicholas Niles Sears, Jr., William Stork, Johnson and Freedman, LLC, Brock & Scott, PLLC and Does 1-5
Case Number: 7:2022cv01734
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2022 Filing 22 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #20 Order, #21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by Geary Thomas Dooly placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Geary Thomas Dooly PO Box 3326 Spartanburg, SC 29304 (rweb, )
July 20, 2022 Filing 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; for the reasons explained above, it is recommended that the Complaint filed in this action be summarily DISMISSED without leave to amend and without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 8/3/2022 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 7/20/22. (rweb, ) Modified on 7/20/2022 to edit text (rweb, ).
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff (or petitioner) to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 7/20/22. (rweb, )
July 19, 2022 Filing 18 OBJECTION to #14 Report and Recommendation by Geary Thomas Dooly. Reply to Objections due by 8/2/2022 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Chain of Title Analysis & Mortgage Fraud Investigation, #2 Affidavit of Joseph R Esquivel Jr, #3 Affidavit of Clayton Cherry, #4 Who really owns your debt contract)(rweb, )
July 6, 2022 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #13 Second Proper Form Order and AO 240 placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Geary Thomas Dooly PO Box 3326 Spartanburg, SC 29304 (rweb, )
July 6, 2022 Filing 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; based upon the foregoing, the Court recommends that Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction [Doc. #9 ] be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 7/20/2022 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 7/6/22. (rweb, )
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SECOND PROPER FORM ORDER; Case to be brought into proper form by 7/27/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 7/6/22. (rweb, )
June 30, 2022 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Geary Thomas Dooly.(rweb, )
June 29, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Expedited Preliminary Injunction by Geary Thomas Dooly. Response to Motion due by 7/13/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(rweb, )
June 6, 2022 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #6 Proper Form Order, AO 240 form, pro-se 26.01 form, and 5 x 285 forms placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Geary Thomas Dooly PO Box 3326 Spartanburg, SC 29304 (sgri)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 6/27/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D. Austin on 6/6/2022. (sgri)
June 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brock & Scott, PLLC, Does 1-5, Johnson and Freedman, LLC, Nicholas Niles Sears, Jr, William Stork, filed by Geary Thomas Dooly. Service due by 8/31/2022 (Attachments: #1 Additional Attachments to Complaint) (sgri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dooly v. Sears et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geary Thomas Dooly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Niles Sears, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Stork
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Freedman, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brock & Scott, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?