Grimes et al v. Davenport Trucking LLC et al
Plaintiff: John Wayne Grimes and Penny Diane Grimes
Defendant: Davenport Trucking LLC and Delasamie Traviel Brantley
Not Classified By Court: Auto-Owners Ins Company
Case Number: 7:2022cv03853
Filed: November 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2022 Filing 28 Plaintiffs Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by John Wayne Grimes, Penny Diane Grimes.(Killoren, Thomas)
December 13, 2022 Filing 27 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Delasamie Traviel Brantley, Davenport Trucking LLC.(Tucker, Briggs)
December 13, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Jonathan Clark on behalf of Auto-Owners Ins Company (Clark, Thomas)
December 13, 2022 Filing 25 ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Auto-Owners Ins Company(Clark, Thomas)
December 13, 2022 Filing 24 Conditional ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) by Auto-Owners Ins Company.(Clark, Thomas)
December 13, 2022 Filing 23 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Auto-Owners Ins Company.(Clark, Thomas)
December 13, 2022 Filing 22 Conditional ANSWER to Complaint by Auto-Owners Ins Company.(Clark, Thomas) Modified on 12/14/2022: See #24 Amended Answer (kmca).
December 8, 2022 Filing 21 CONSENT AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Local Rule 26.03 Answers due by 12/14/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/1/2023, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 5/1/2023, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 6/5/2023, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/1/2023, Discovery due by 9/1/2023, Mediation Due by 10/3/2023, Motions due by 11/17/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 2/5/2024 or sixty (60) days after dispositive motions have been resolved. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 12/8/22. (kmca)
December 1, 2022 Filing 19 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Delasamie Traviel Brantley, Davenport Trucking LLC, Penny Diane Grimes, John Wayne Grimes (Tucker, Briggs) Modified on 12/2/2022 to add parties listed as filers (alew).
December 1, 2022 Filing 18 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Delasamie Traviel Brantley, Davenport Trucking LLC., Penny Diane Grimes, John Wayne Grimes (Tucker, Briggs) Modified on 12/2/2022 to add parties listed as filers (alew).
December 1, 2022 Filing 17 ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION Defendant by Delasamie Traviel Brantley, Davenport Trucking LLC(Tucker, Briggs)
December 1, 2022 Filing 16 ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION Plaintiff by John Wayne Grimes, Penny Diane Grimes(Killoren, Thomas)
November 28, 2022 Filing 14 REPLY by Delasamie Traviel Brantley, Davenport Trucking LLC to 11 Order,,,, Set Deadlines,,, Diversity of Citizenship Response. (Tucker, Briggs)
November 16, 2022 Filing 13 MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 5/8/2023. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 11/16/22. (kmca)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 12/6/2022, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 12/20/2022, ADR Statement/Certification due by 12/20/2022, Rule 26 Report due by 12/20/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/30/2023, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/1/2023, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/31/2023, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/31/2023, Discovery due by 5/1/2023, Motions due by 5/15/2023, Jury Selection Deadline 7/14/2023 or sixty (60) days after dispositive motions have been resolved. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 11/16/22. (kmca)
November 16, 2022 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER. Jurisdiction in this matter is predicated upon diversity of citizenship pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332. Within ten (10) days of the date of this order, Defendant Davenport Trucking LLC is to inform the court of the citizenship of all members for the purpose of determining whether the requirements of federal subject matter jurisdiction are satisfied. See 28 U.S.C. 1332; Gen. Tech. Applications, Inc. v. Exro Ltda, 388 F. 3d 114, 121 (4th Cir. 2004) (holding that "[a limited liability company] is an unincorporated association, akin to a partnership for diversity purposes, whose citizenship is that of its members."). Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 11/16/22. (Reply due by 11/28/2022.)(kmca)
November 9, 2022 Filing 10 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER #9 Answer. Reason: duplicate filing - as verified by filing user - see entry #7 Answer. (kmca)
November 7, 2022 Filing 8 Plaintiff Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by John Wayne Grimes, Penny Diane Grimes.(Killoren, Thomas)
November 4, 2022 Filing 7 Davenport Trucking LLC and Delasaime Traviel Brantley ANSWER to Complaint by Delasamie Traviel Brantley, Davenport Trucking LLC.(Tucker, Briggs)
November 4, 2022 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are due fourteen (14) days after removal. (kmca)
November 3, 2022 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Delasamie Traviel Brantley, Davenport Trucking LLC.(kmca)
November 3, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2022-CP-42-03619. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ASCDC-10784975), filed by Delasamie Traviel Brantley, Davenport Trucking LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit Acceptance of Service)(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimes et al v. Davenport Trucking LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Wayne Grimes
Represented By: Thomas A Killoren, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penny Diane Grimes
Represented By: Thomas A Killoren, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davenport Trucking LLC
Represented By: Briggs Paul Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delasamie Traviel Brantley
Represented By: Briggs Paul Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Auto-Owners Ins Company
Represented By: Robert Eric Davis
Represented By: Thomas Jonathan Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?