King et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Richard D King and Lonie C King
Defendant: Clark-Reliance LLC, Crane Instrumentation & Sampling Pft Corp, Paramount Global, Redco Corporation, Uniroyal Holding, Inc, Valves And Controls US, Inc formerly known as Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co Inc, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Clark-Reliance Corporation and its Jerguson Gage & Value Division, Coffin Turbo Pump, Inc, Copes-Vulcan, Inc., Crane Instrumentation & Sampling Inc, Circor Instrumentation Technologies Inc, Hoke Inc, Crosby Valve, LLC, Dezurik, Inc, Electrolux Home Products, Inc, Flowserve US Inc, FMC Corporation, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, General Electric Company, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Hopeman Brothers, Inc, IMO Industries, Inc, John Crane, Inc, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, ViacomCBS Inc, CBS Corporation, a Delaware Corporation, Viacom Inc, successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania Corporation, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, and as successor-in-interest to BF Sturtevant, Crane Co., Spirax Sarco, SPX Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, U.S. Rubber Company Inc, Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc d, Velan Valve Corp., Warren Pumps LLC and William Powell Company, The
Case Number: 7:2023cv05771
Filed: November 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Joseph Dawson
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2024 Filing 55 ANSWER to Complaint by Valves And Controls US, Inc.(Patterson, Matthew)
January 3, 2024 Filing 54 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by SPX Corporation.(O'Neill, Mary)
January 3, 2024 Filing 53 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Crosby Valve, LLC.(O'Neill, Mary)
December 28, 2023 Filing 52 TEXT ORDER granting unopposed #48 Plaintiffs' Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Stay. Plaintiffs' response to Defendant Crane Instrumentation & Sampling PFT Corp.'s Motion to Stay shall be filed on or before January 18, 2024. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 12/28/2023. (hcic, )
December 27, 2023 Filing 51 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Redco Corporation.(Sullivan, Tara)
December 26, 2023 Filing 50 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(Bogle, Michael)
December 26, 2023 Filing 49 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Lonie C King, Richard D King. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Holder, Jonathan)
December 22, 2023 Filing 48 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #46 MOTION to Stay by Lonie C King, Richard D King. Response to Motion due by 1/5/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Holder, Jonathan)
December 19, 2023 Filing 47 Rule 26 Statement of Facts by Clark-Reliance LLC.(Inabinet, George)
December 14, 2023 Filing 46 MOTION to Stay by Crane Instrumentation & Sampling Pft Corp. Response to Motion due by 12/28/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Liquidation and Injunction Order with Bar, #2 Exhibit B Notice of Liquidation of Arrowood Indemnity Company and Instructions from Receiver dated 11/17/23) No proposed order. (Kozick, Stephen) Modified on 12/21/2023 to add descriptions to exhibits as provided by filing user (lgib, ).
December 8, 2023 Filing 45 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Crane Instrumentation & Sampling Pft Corp.(Kozick, Stephen)
December 5, 2023 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie G Flynn on behalf of Armstrong International, Inc. (Flynn, Stephanie)
December 5, 2023 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie G Flynn on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC (Flynn, Stephanie)
December 5, 2023 Filing 42 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Richard King and Lonie King (Plaintiffs) by Lonie C King, Richard D King. (Holder, Jonathan)
December 4, 2023 Filing 41 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Clark-Reliance LLC.(Inabinet, George)
November 30, 2023 Filing 40 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Flowserve US Inc.(Montgomery, John)
November 27, 2023 Filing 39 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Clark-Reliance LLC.(Inabinet, George)
November 22, 2023 Filing 38 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by SPX Corporation.(O'Neill, Mary)
November 22, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth O'Neill on behalf of SPX Corporation (O'Neill, Mary)
November 22, 2023 Filing 36 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Crosby Valve, LLC.(O'Neill, Mary)
November 22, 2023 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth O'Neill on behalf of Crosby Valve, LLC (O'Neill, Mary)
November 20, 2023 Filing 34 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Warren Pumps LLC.(Cherry, Nicolas)
November 20, 2023 Filing 33 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Armstrong International, Inc..(Cherry, Nicolas)
November 20, 2023 Filing 32 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Notice of Removal,. First attachment description: Supplemental State Court Filings . (Techman, Jennifer)
November 17, 2023 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint by Warren Pumps LLC.(Cherry, Nicolas)
November 17, 2023 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint by Armstrong International, Inc..(Cherry, Nicolas)
November 17, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by William Henry Kleindienst on behalf of Velan Valve Corp. (Kleindienst, William)
November 17, 2023 Filing 28 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Velan Valve Corp..(Rawl, A)
November 17, 2023 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint by Velan Valve Corp..(Rawl, A)
November 17, 2023 Filing 26 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(Bogle, Michael)
November 15, 2023 Filing 25 CONSENT TO REMOVAL FROM STATE COURT by Union Carbide Corporation. (Conner, William)
November 15, 2023 Filing 24 CONSENT TO REMOVAL FROM STATE COURT by FMC Corporation. (Conner, William)
November 15, 2023 Filing 23 CONSENT TO REMOVAL FROM STATE COURT by Coffin Turbo Pump, Inc. (Conner, William)
November 15, 2023 Filing 22 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Union Carbide Corporation.(Conner, William)
November 15, 2023 Filing 21 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by FMC Corporation.(Conner, William)
November 15, 2023 Filing 20 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Coffin Turbo Pump, Inc.(Conner, William)
November 15, 2023 Filing 19 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Redco Corporation.(Sullivan, Tara)
November 14, 2023 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by John Crane, Inc.(Elliott, James)
November 14, 2023 Filing 17 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Spirax Sarco.(Techman, Jennifer)
November 14, 2023 Filing 16 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Techman, Jennifer)
November 14, 2023 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.(Techman, Jennifer)
November 14, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Spirax Sarco.(Techman, Jennifer)
November 14, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Techman, Jennifer)
November 14, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Electrolux Home Products, Inc.(Techman, Jennifer)
November 14, 2023 Filing 11 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER.Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 12/5/2023, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 12/19/2023, Rule 26 Report due by 12/19/2023, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/9/2024, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/8/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/11/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/11/2024, Discovery due by 5/13/2024, Motions due by 6/12/2024, Jury Selection Deadline 9/10/2024, Mediation Due by 5/13/2024. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 11/14/2023. (lgib, )
November 14, 2023 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by John Crane, Inc.(Elliott, James)
November 14, 2023 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Wall, Mark)
November 14, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron Dane Berthelsen on behalf of John Crane, Inc (Berthelsen, Cameron)
November 14, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James H Elliott, Jr on behalf of John Crane, Inc (Elliott, James)
November 14, 2023 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by John Crane, Inc.(Elliott, James)
November 14, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF JOINDER of Removal by James H Elliott, Jr on behalf of John Crane, Inc (Elliott, James)
November 13, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Paramount Global.(Techman, Jennifer)
November 10, 2023 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Paramount Global. (lgib, )
November 10, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Spartanburg County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2023-CP-42-03852 (filing fee $402 receipt number ASCDC-11422981), filed by Paramount Global. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents - Plaintiffs Motion to Expedite and Answers, #2 State Court Documents - Summons and Complaint) (lgib, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark-Reliance LLC
Represented By: George L Inabinet, Jr
Represented By: Casey Lee Austin
Represented By: Kelly Lynn Near
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Instrumentation & Sampling Pft Corp
Represented By: Stephen Michael Kozick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paramount Global
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redco Corporation
Represented By: Tara Cloer Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uniroyal Holding, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valves And Controls US, Inc formerly known as Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc d/b/a Atwood & Morrill Co Inc
Represented By: Matthew D Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Matthew D Patterson
Represented By: Deirdre Shelton McCool
Represented By: G Mark Phillips
Represented By: James H Burns
Represented By: Michael P Stover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: Nicolas John Cherry
Represented By: Stephanie G Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark-Reliance Corporation and its Jerguson Gage & Value Division
Represented By: George L Inabinet, Jr
Represented By: Casey Lee Austin
Represented By: Kelly Lynn Near
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coffin Turbo Pump, Inc
Represented By: William David Conner
Represented By: Carson S Phillips
Represented By: Scott E Frick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copes-Vulcan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Instrumentation & Sampling Inc
Represented By: Stephen Michael Kozick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circor Instrumentation Technologies Inc
Represented By: Stephen Michael Kozick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoke Inc
Represented By: Stephen Michael Kozick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Valve, LLC
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dezurik, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products, Inc
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc
Represented By: John M Montgomery
Represented By: Rachel M Hutchens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: William David Conner
Represented By: Carson S Phillips
Represented By: Scott E Frick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: Michael J Bogle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc
Represented By: William Peter Maurides
Represented By: Daniel Bowman White
Represented By: Ronald G Tate, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc
Represented By: William Ansel Collins, Jr
Represented By: Michal Kalwajtys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc
Represented By: Cameron Dane Berthelsen
Represented By: James H Elliott, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark Hedderman Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation, a Delaware Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Inc, successor-by-merger to CBS Corporation, a Pennsylvania Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation, and as successor-in-interest to BF Sturtevant
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Tara Cloer Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco
Represented By: Jennifer M Techman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX Corporation
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: William David Conner
Represented By: Carson S Phillips
Represented By: Scott E Frick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Rubber Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA Inc d
Represented By: Matthew D Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corp.
Represented By: A Victor Rawl, Jr
Represented By: William Henry Kleindienst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Nicolas John Cherry
Represented By: Stephanie G Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Powell Company, The
Represented By: Matthew D Patterson
Represented By: Deirdre Shelton McCool
Represented By: G Mark Phillips
Represented By: James H Burns
Represented By: Michael P Stover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard D King
Represented By: Theile Branham McVey
Represented By: Jamie Rae Rutkoski
Represented By: Jonathan Marshall Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonie C King
Represented By: Theile Branham McVey
Represented By: Jamie Rae Rutkoski
Represented By: Jonathan Marshall Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?