Hege et al v. Aegon USA LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stephen K Hege and Linda S Hege
Defendant: Aegon USA LLC and Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2010cv01578
Filed: June 21, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Anderson/Greenwood Office
County: Pickens
Presiding Judge: G Ross Anderson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion for Protective Order as set out in this order; granting 66 Motion to Compel; granting 69 Motion to Compel. Transamerica shall produce the documents ordered to Plaintiffs on or before May 16, 2011. Signed by Honorable G Ross Anderson, Jr on 5/10/11.(gpre, )
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 51 Motion to Compel Differential Information. Transamerica shall provide Plaintiffs the information requested in Interrogatory 9 and Interrogatory 10 within thirty (30) days. Signed by Honorable G Ross Anderson, Jr on 3/25/11.(gpre, )
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying 20 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable G Ross Anderson, Jr on 1/21/2011.(pbri, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hege et al v. Aegon USA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen K Hege
Represented By: Susan F Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda S Hege
Represented By: Susan F Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aegon USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transamerica Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?