Jackson v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Gray Helms Jackson
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 8:2014cv04906
Filed: December 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Anderson/Greenwood Office
County: York
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 15 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/1/2016.(abuc)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JUDGMENT / The court has ordered that the Commissioner's decision is reversed and the action is remanded for further administrative action. (abuc)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER adopting 11 Report and Recommendation. The Commissioner's decision is reversed pursuant to Sentence Four of42 U.S.C. § 405(g), and this action is remanded to the Commissioner for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/27/2016.(abuc) (Main Document 13 replaced on 1/28/2016) (egra, ). Modified on 1/28/2016 to correct caption (egra, ).
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint - Social Security, filed by Gray Helms Jackson. It is recommended that the Commissioner's decision be REVERSED and the case be REMANDED to the Commissioner pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) for further administrative action. Objections to R&R due by 2/12/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 1/26/2016. (abuc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gray Helms Jackson
Represented By: William B Jung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?