Ashmore v. Sullivan et al

Plaintiff: Beattie B Ashmore
Defendant: Lucile M Sullivan and Hewlett K Sullivan, Jr
Case Number: 8:2015cv00563
Filed: February 6, 2015
Court: South Carolina District Court
Office: Anderson/Greenwood Office
County: Greenville
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1367
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 14, 2017 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendants' 71 Motion to Certify and Amend the Order for Interlocutory Review Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b). Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 9/14/17.(kmca)
February 8, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and OPINION denying 48 Motion for Reconsideration re 46 Order on Motion for to Certify Questions. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 2/8/17.(alew, )
February 1, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 47 Motion for Reconsideration as set out. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 2/1/17.(alew, )
November 28, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and OPINION denying 39 Motion to Certify Questions of State Law. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 11/28/16.(alew, )
March 2, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and OPINION denying 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 3/2/16.(alew, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashmore v. Sullivan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beattie B Ashmore
Represented By: Lauren S Price
Represented By: Lewis Walter Tollison, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucile M Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett K Sullivan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?