Ashmore v. Owens
Plaintiff: Beattie B Ashmore
Defendant: Brigitte Owens
Case Number: 8:2015cv02373
Filed: June 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Anderson/Greenwood Office
County: Anderson
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1367
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER and OPINION denying 51 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion for Summary Judgment, granting 90 Motion for Ruling and Stipulations. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 11/17/17.(alew, ) Modified on 11/17/2017 to edit text (alew, ).
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion to Strike. Because Plaintiff has asserted both legal and equitable claims and Defendant has demanded a jury trial, Plaintiff's 35 motion to strike is GRANTED IN PART with respect to the unjust enrichment claim and DENIED IN PART with respect to the fraudulent conveyance claim. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/13/17.(kmca)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER and OPINION denying 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 11 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/12/16.(alew, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashmore v. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beattie B Ashmore
Represented By: Lauren S Price
Represented By: Lewis Walter Tollison, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brigitte Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?