Shepherd v. Community First Bank et al
Plaintiff: |
Frederick D Shepherd, Jr |
Defendant: |
Community First Bank, Richard D Burleson, Gary V Thrift, Larry S Bowman, William M Brown, John R Hamrick, James E Turner, Charles L Winchester and Robert H Edwards |
Case Number: |
8:2015cv04337 |
Filed: |
October 23, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of South Carolina |
Office: |
Anderson/Greenwood Office |
County: |
Oconee |
Presiding Judge: |
Mary Geiger Lewis |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. § 1002 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 25, 2019 |
Filing
154
OPINION AND ORDER staying 139 Motion for Attorney Fees pending appeal; denying 148 Motion to Stay. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 6/25/2019.(abuc)
|
March 28, 2019 |
Filing
138
JUDGMENT / The court has ordered that the Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Judgment is granted and Defendants' Memorandum in Support ofJudgment is denied. (abuc)
|
February 24, 2017 |
Filing
65
OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and dismissing without prejudice in part 44 Motion to Dismiss; dismissing 44 Motion to Stay; dismissing without prejudice 48 Motion to Compel; dismissing without prejudice 51 Moti on to Amend/Correct. It is the judgment of the Court Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN PART. The portion of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss seeking to require Plaintiff to exhaust administrati ve remedies available under the Plan is GRANTED. Plaintiff and Defendants are hereby ordered to complete a full review of Plaintiff's benefits claim under the claim review procedures of the Plan within sixty days of the filing of this Order. The remainder of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE with leave to refile. All other non-dispositive motions pending in this matter are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE with leave to re-file. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 2/24/2017.(abuc)
|
March 7, 2016 |
Filing
34
ORDER denying 7 Motion to Remand; denying 7 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 18 Motion to Strike 16 Response in Opposition to Motion. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this Order in which to amend his Complaint in this federal action. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 3/7/2016.(abuc)
|
February 2, 2016 |
Filing
33
CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER granting 31 Motion for Confidentiality Order. Signed by Honorable Mary Geiger Lewis on 2/2/2016.(abuc)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Shepherd v. Community First Bank et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Frederick D Shepherd, Jr |
Represented By: |
Douglas Franklin Patrick |
Represented By: |
Austin Fletcher Watts |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Community First Bank |
Represented By: |
David Richard Price, Jr |
Represented By: |
Samuel Barton Tooker |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Richard D Burleson |
Represented By: |
David Richard Price, Jr |
Represented By: |
Samuel Barton Tooker |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Gary V Thrift |
Represented By: |
David Richard Price, Jr |
Represented By: |
Samuel Barton Tooker |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Larry S Bowman |
Represented By: |
David Richard Price, Jr |
Represented By: |
Samuel Barton Tooker |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: William M Brown |
Represented By: |
David Richard Price, Jr |
Represented By: |
Samuel Barton Tooker |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: John R Hamrick |
Represented By: |
David Richard Price, Jr |
Represented By: |
Samuel Barton Tooker |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: James E Turner |
Represented By: |
David Richard Price, Jr |
Represented By: |
Samuel Barton Tooker |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Charles L Winchester |
Represented By: |
David Richard Price, Jr |
Represented By: |
Samuel Barton Tooker |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Robert H Edwards |
Represented By: |
David Richard Price, Jr |
Represented By: |
Samuel Barton Tooker |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?