Lake Russell Holdings LLC et al v. Evergreen Resources Ltd Inc et al

Plaintiff: Lake Russell Holdings LLC and Lake Russell Lending LLC
Defendant: Ryan R Faulkenberry, Evergreen Resources Ltd Inc and William R Faulkenberry
Case Number: 8:2018cv01928
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Anderson/Greenwood Office
County: XUS, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER; Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/26/2018, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/10/2018, Rule 26 Report due by 10/10/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/20/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/22/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/23/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/23/2019, Discovery due by 5/23/2019, Motion in Limine due by 8/6/2019, Motions due by 6/6/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/19/2019, Pretrial Briefs due by 8/13/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 8/20/2019. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 9/6/18. (sfla, )
September 6, 2018 Filing 16 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Evergreen Resources Ltd Inc, Ryan R Faulkenberry, William R Faulkenberry.(Pruitt, J)
September 6, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Lake Russell Holdings LLC by Ryan R Faulkenberry, Evergreen Resources Ltd Inc, William R Faulkenberry.(Pruitt, J)
August 30, 2018 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint by all Defendants. Answers due by 9/11/2018. Entered by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on August 30, 2018. (bedw)
August 30, 2018 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer Complaint ( Response to Motion due by 9/13/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ), Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for Defendants to Answer Complaint by Lake Russell Holdings LLC, Lake Russell Lending LLC. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Poston, Brandon)
August 23, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lake Russell Lending LLC, Lake Russell Holdings LLC. William R Faulkenberry served on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service)(Poston, Brandon)
August 23, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lake Russell Lending LLC, Lake Russell Holdings LLC. Ryan R Faulkenberry served on 7/25/2018, answer due 8/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service)(Poston, Brandon)
August 23, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lake Russell Lending LLC, Lake Russell Holdings LLC. Evergreen Resources Ltd Inc served on 7/25/2018, answer due 8/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service)(Poston, Brandon)
July 24, 2018 Filing 7 REPLY by Lake Russell Holdings LLC, Lake Russell Lending LLC to #6 Order,, Set Deadlines, . (Poston, Brandon)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that Lake Russell Holdings, LLC and Lake Russell Lending, LLC inform the court of the citizenship of all of their members within 10 days of the date of this order. (Specific Document due by 7/30/2018). Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 7/19/18. (sfla)
July 13, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Evergreen Resources Ltd Inc, Ryan R Faulkenberry, William R Faulkenberry. (sfla)
July 13, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lake Russell Holdings LLC, Lake Russell Lending LLC. (sfla)
July 13, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lake Russell Holdings LLC, Lake Russell Lending LLC.(sfla)
July 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Evergreen Resources Ltd Inc, Ryan R Faulkenberry, William R Faulkenberry ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7887048) filed by Lake Russell Lending LLC, Lake Russell Holdings LLC. Service due by 10/11/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Operating Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Declarations, #3 Exhibit C - Modification and Forbearance Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Lake Russell - Feb. 2017 Demand Ltr., #5 Exhibit E - Settlement Agreement, #6 Exhibit F - Affidavit Of Dissolution, #7 Exhibit G - Lake Russell - Oct. 2017 Default Ltr.)(sfla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lake Russell Holdings LLC et al v. Evergreen Resources Ltd Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lake Russell Holdings LLC
Represented By: Graham Smith Mitchell
Represented By: Brandon Keith Poston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lake Russell Lending LLC
Represented By: Graham Smith Mitchell
Represented By: Brandon Keith Poston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan R Faulkenberry
Represented By: J Calhoun Pruitt, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evergreen Resources Ltd Inc
Represented By: J Calhoun Pruitt, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R Faulkenberry
Represented By: J Calhoun Pruitt, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?