Boyle et al v. Bi-Lo LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Boyle and Nicole Boyle
Defendant: Bi-Lo LLC, Coca-Cola Bottling Company Consolidated and Coca-Cola Bottling Company United Inc
Case Number: 8:2018cv02153
Filed: August 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Anderson/Greenwood Office
County: Abbeville
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Filing 21 MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 3/25/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 10/3/18. (kmca)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/23/2018, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 11/6/2018, Rule 26 Report due by 11/6/2018, ADR/Mediation Statement due by 11/6/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/17/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/16/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/15/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/15/2019, Discovery due by 3/18/2019, Motions due by 4/1/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/3/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 6/3/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 10/3/18. (kmca)
September 26, 2018 Filing 19 Coca-Cola Bottling Complany Consolidated REPLY to Crossclaim #18 , CROSSCLAIM against Bi-Lo LLC by Coca-Cola Bottling Company Consolidated.(McGee, Clarence)
September 14, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Coca-Cola Bottling Company Consolidated, Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc. by Bi-Lo LLC.(Tonnsen, Eric)
September 13, 2018 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bi-Lo LLC. Coca-Cola Bottling Company United Inc. served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certified mail return receipt)(kmca) Modified on 9/13/2018: document re-filed by clerk to correct event (kmca).
September 12, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to #15 Second Amended Complaint, by Coca-Cola Bottling Company Consolidated.(McGee, Clarence) Modified on 9/12/2018: to add "second" (kmca).
September 10, 2018 Filing 15 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bi-Lo LLC, Coca-Cola Bottling Company Consolidated, filed by Nicole Boyle, Nicholas Boyle. Service due by 12/10/2018 (Slaughter, Charles) Modified on 9/11/2018: to add "second" (kmca). (Main Document 15 replaced on 9/11/2018: to replace with corrected document as provided by filing user) (kmca).
September 6, 2018 Filing 14 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc..(McGee, Clarence)
September 6, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc..(McGee, Clarence)
September 5, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicole Boyle, Nicholas Boyle. Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc. served on 8/22/2018, answer due 9/12/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail Return Receipt)(kmca) Document re-filed by clerk to correct event. (kmca)
September 5, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc. (kmca)
August 31, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc. by Bi-Lo LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed summons)(Tonnsen, Eric) Modified on 9/4/2018: to delete attachment - proposed summons not filed (kmca).
August 20, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc. (kmca)
August 20, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bi-Lo LLC, Coca-Cola Bottling Company United, Inc., filed by Nicole Boyle, Nicholas Boyle. Service due by 11/19/2018 (Slaughter, Charles)
August 7, 2018 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Nicholas Boyle, Nicole Boyle.(Slaughter, Charles)
August 6, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Bi-Lo LLC.(kmca)
August 6, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Bi-Lo LLC.(kmca)
August 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Abbeville County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-CP-01-00217. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-7926906), filed by Bi-Lo LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyle et al v. Bi-Lo LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Boyle
Represented By: Samuel Kirkpatrick Morgan, Jr
Represented By: Charles Thomas Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Boyle
Represented By: Samuel Kirkpatrick Morgan, Jr
Represented By: Charles Thomas Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bi-Lo LLC
Represented By: Eric Richard Tonnsen
Represented By: Jeffrey Brendan Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coca-Cola Bottling Company Consolidated
Represented By: Clarence William McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coca-Cola Bottling Company United Inc
Represented By: Clarence William McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?