Walker v. C & S Wholesale Services Inc

Plaintiff: Robert Walker
Defendant: C & S Wholesale Services Inc
Case Number: 8:2018cv03044
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 12/27/2018. (abuc)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement by Robert Walker (Bax, Nathaniel)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER C & S Wholesale Services Inc answer due 12/27/2018. (Wood, Robert)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to C & S Wholesale Services Inc. (abuc)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Robert Walker.(abuc)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against C & S Wholesale Services Inc (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8100158.), filed by Robert Walker. Service due by 2/7/2019(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. C & S Wholesale Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & S Wholesale Services Inc
Represented By: Robert M Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Walker
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Alderson
Represented By: Nathaniel W Bax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?