Shayne v. Discover Bank
Plaintiff: Leslie Jay Shayne and Les Shayne
Defendant: Discover Bank
Case Number: 8:2019cv00494
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 17 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 16 Transfer of Case Management, #15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Discover Bank, #5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Discover Bank placed in U.S. Mail to Leslie Jay Shayne (kric, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 16 ***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Bruce H. Hendricks. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: US District Court, 300 E Washington Street, Greenville, SC 29601. (kric, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that this action be dismissed for lack of prosecution pursuant to Rule 41(b). Should the court adopt this recommendation, the defendant's #5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and #6 MOTION to Dismiss will be rendered moot. IT IS SO RECOMMENDED. Objections to R&R due by 4/12/19. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 3/29/19. (ctuc, )
February 22, 2019 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #11 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail to Leslie Jay Shayne with interrogatories (kric, ) Modified on 2/22/2019 to edit text (kric, ).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER The plaintiff is directed to answer the attached interrogatories, then sign, date, and return them to the Clerk of Court by 3/14/19. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order, the Court's Special Interrogatory, a copy of the Local Civ. Rule 26.01 (D.S.C.) interrogatories, and a copy of the court's pro se litigant guide to the plaintiff. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 2/21/19. (Attachments: #1 Court's interrogatory)(ctuc, )
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #7 Roseboro Order, placed in U.S. Mail to Leslie Jay Shayne (kric, )
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ROSEBORO ORDER directing clerk to forward summary judgment explanation to the opposing party and directing that party to respond in 31 days. Response due to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Response to Motion due by 3/25/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 2/21/2019. (kric, )
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Discover Bank. Response to Motion due by 3/6/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - Order for Injunctive and Other Relief)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(Elliott, David)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Discover Bank. Response to Motion due by 3/6/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Consolidate)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(Elliott, David)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Discover Bank.(abuc)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oconee County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-37-00039. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8279904), filed by Discover Bank. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shayne v. Discover Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Jay Shayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Les Shayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Bank
Represented By: David Alan Elliott
Represented By: Ryan Sikes Rummage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?