Walker v. Koon et al

Plaintiff: David Richard Walker, Jr
Defendant: Sheriff Bryan J Koon and Ex Sheriff James R Metts
Case Number: 8:2019cv00688
Filed: March 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, Jr, #9 Order - 1983 - No Service, 8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail to David Richard Walker Jr. (gpre, )
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION it is recommended that the District Court dismiss the case without service of process. Objections to R&R due by 3/29/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 3/15/2019. (gpre, )
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Plaintiff has incurred a debt to the U.S.A. in the amount of $350 Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 3/15/2019. (gpre, )
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 3/15/2019.(gpre, )
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Columbia. (gpre, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by David Richard Walker, Jr. Response to Motion due by 3/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Financial Certificate)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(gpre, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bryan J Koon, James R Metts, filed by David Richard Walker, Jr. Service due by 6/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Cover letter) (gpre, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Koon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Richard Walker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Bryan J Koon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ex Sheriff James R Metts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?