Ringer v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Laura Ringer
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv01394
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 6/18/19. (kmca)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, Laura Ringer.(Devlin, Chadwick) Modified on 6/17/2019: to add joint filer as listed. (kmca).
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Newberry County. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Acknowledgment of Receipt of Copy of Notice of Removal Ringer [filed])(Devlin, Chadwick)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company.(Devlin, Chadwick)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 MEDIATION ORDER. Mediation Due by 11/5/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 5/17/19. (kmca)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/6/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 6/20/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 6/20/2019,ADR/Mediation Statement due by 6/20/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/31/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/30/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/30/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/30/2019, Discovery due by 10/30/2019, Motions due by 11/13/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 1/3/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 2/3/2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 5/17/19. (kmca)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Laura Ringer.(Peace, John)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company.(kmca)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Newberry County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-36-00164. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-8440733), filed by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit Notice of Dismissal as to Newberry County Memorial Hospital filed in State Court)(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ringer v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Don Lawrence Kristinik, III
Represented By: Chadwick S Devlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Ringer
Represented By: John R Peace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?