Trott v. Grace Management, Inc
Plaintiff: Leisha Trott
Defendant: Grace Management, Inc
Case Number: 8:2019cv01621
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 18 ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Leisha Trott(Arnold, Brian)
July 8, 2019 Filing 17 ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Grace Management, Inc(Reeves, George)
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Grace Management, Inc.(Reeves, George)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Grace Management, Inc., Leisha Trott (Reeves, George) Modified on 7/9/2019 to edit filers and text (kric, ).
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Grace Management, Inc., Leisha Trott (Reeves, George) Modified on 7/9/2019 to edit filers and text (kric, ).
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Leisha Trott.(Arnold, Brian)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by George Alfred Reeves, III for August 1, 2019 through August 8, 2019 (Reeves, George)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Patrick James Dudek on behalf of Grace Management, Inc (Dudek, Benjamin)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Grace Management, Inc.(Reeves, George)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 12/2/2019, Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 6/10/2019. (kric, )
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/1/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/15/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 7/15/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/26/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/25/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/25/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/25/2019, Discovery due by 11/25/2019, Motion in Limine due by 3/6/2020, Motions due by 12/9/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 3/6/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 4/7/2020, Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 6/10/2019. (kric, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Leisha Trott.(Arnold, Brian)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Grace Management, Inc, filed by Leisha Trott. Service due by 9/9/2019 (Arnold, Brian)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff's LR26.01 interrogatories are due 6/17/2019. (kric, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Grace Management, Inc.(kric, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pickens County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019CP3900574. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8485955), filed by Grace Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(kric, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trott v. Grace Management, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Management, Inc
Represented By: George Alfred Reeves, III
Represented By: Benjamin Patrick James Dudek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leisha Trott
Represented By: Brian E Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?