Hieronymus v. Barron et al
Plaintiff: Bradley Hieronymus
Defendant: Alesia Smith, Felix Barron, Clemson University and Board of Trustees of Clemson University, The
Case Number: 8:2019cv01720
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/9/19, Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witness due by 1/7/20, Defendants' ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/6/20, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/6/20, Discovery due by 3/9/20, Mediation Due by 3/16/20, Motions due by 3/23/20, Motion in Limine due by 6/4/20, Jury Selection Deadline 7/6/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 7/29/19. (ctuc, )
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Board of Trustees of Clemson University, The, Clemson University, Alesia Smith, Bradley Hieronymous and Felix Barron (Turner, Charles) Modified on 7/29/2019 to edit filers and text (kric, ).
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 12/16/2019, Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 6/25/2019. (kric, )
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/15/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/29/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 7/29/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/9/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/9/2019, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/8/2019, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/8/2019, Discovery due by 12/9/2019, Motion in Limine due by 3/6/2020, Motions due by 12/23/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 3/6/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 4/7/2020, Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 6/25/2019. (kric, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Bradley Hieronymus.(Reckenbeil, John)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Christopher Smith, Jr on behalf of Felix Barron (Smith, Philip)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Felix Barron.(Walsh, James)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT TO REMOVAL FROM STATE COURT by Felix Barron. (Walsh, James)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Felix Barron.(Walsh, James)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT TO REMOVAL FROM STATE COURT by Board of Trustees of Clemson University, The, Clemson University, Alesia Smith. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Acknowledgement of Receipt of Notice of Removal)(Turner, Charles)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Board of Trustees of Clemson University, The, Clemson University, Alesia Smith.(Turner, Charles)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff's LR26.01 interrogatories due as to plaintiff by 6/28/2019 (kric, ) Modified on 6/17/2019 to edit text (kric, ).
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Board of Trustees of Clemson University, The, Clemson University, Alesia Smith.(kric, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oconee County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-37-00282. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8506101), filed by Clemson University, Board of Trustees of Clemson University, The, Alesia Smith. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Notice of Filing Removal)(kric, ) Modified on 6/17/2019 to edit text (kric, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/17/2019) (kric, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hieronymus v. Barron et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alesia Smith
Represented By: Wilson S Sheldon
Represented By: Charles F Turner, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix Barron
Represented By: Philip Christopher Smith, Jr
Represented By: James P Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clemson University
Represented By: Wilson S Sheldon
Represented By: Charles F Turner, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of Clemson University, The
Represented By: Wilson S Sheldon
Represented By: Charles F Turner, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Hieronymus
Represented By: John G Reckenbeil
Represented By: Jeffrey Dean Ezell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?