Staton v. Superintendent Lee Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Leroy L Staton
Respondent: Superintendent Lee Correctional Institution
Case Number: 8:2019cv01805
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 22 OBJECTION (duplicate of #19) to #17 Report and Recommendation by Leroy L Staton. Reply to Objections due by 9/4/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(gpre,
August 16, 2019 Filing 19 OBJECTION to #17 Report and Recommendation by Leroy L Staton (signed by Mark Marvin). Reply to Objections due by 8/30/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(gpre, ) Modified on 8/16/2019 to add text (gpre, ).
August 1, 2019 Filing 18 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #16 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer, 15 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion for Extension of Time placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Leroy L Staton 241382 F-2B-Part-2226 Lee Correctional Institution 990 Wisacky Highway Bishopville, SC 29101 (gpre, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Leroy L Staton. It is recommended that this action be dismissed with prejudice and without requiring the Respondent to file an answer or return because the Petition is successive and is clearly untimely under the one year limitations provision of the AEDPA, 28 U.S.C. 2244(d). Objections to R&R due by 8/15/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 8/1/2019. (gpre, )
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk, directing respondent not to answer and directing the petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Petition)(gpre, )
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; finding as moot #13 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 8/1/2019.(gpre, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to comply with proper form order by Leroy L Staton. Response to Motion due by 8/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(gpre, )
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Leroy L Staton. Response to Motion due by 8/9/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(gpre, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #9 Proper Form Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Leroy L Staton 241382 F-2B-Part-2226 Lee Correctional Institution 990 Wisacky Highway Bishopville, SC 29101 with AO240 application and blank 2254 petition (kric, )
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROPER FORM ORDER (SECOND) Case to be brought into proper form by 8/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 7/22/2019. (kric, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time (received from and signed by Mark Marvin) to comply with proper form order by Leroy L Staton. Response to Motion due by 8/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(gpre, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #5 Proper Form Order, AO240 Application, 2254 Petition court form, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Leroy L Staton 241382 F-2B-Part-2226 Lee Correctional Institution 990 Wisacky Highway Bishopville, SC 29101 (gpre, )
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPER FORM ORDER directing Plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Case to be brought into proper form by 7/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 6/28/2019. (gpre, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Florence. (gpre, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Leroy L Staton. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(gpre, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Staton v. Superintendent Lee Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leroy L Staton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Superintendent Lee Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?