Bailey v. Mackelburg
Petitioner: Kamau Bailey
Respondent: Warden W E Mackelburg
Case Number: 8:2019cv01809
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kamau Bailey. Response to Motion due by 9/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.(gpre, )
August 16, 2019 Filing 17 OBJECTION to #13 Report and Recommendation by Kamau Bailey. Reply to Objections due by 8/30/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(gpre, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re #12 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer, served on Attorney General of the United States on 8/8/2019. (gpre, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #12 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to US Attorney General certified mail #70153430000072763314 (gpre, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #12 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer and Petition, #13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, 11 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Kamau Bailey 08191-068 FCI Estill PO Box 699 Estill, SC 29918 (gpre, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION it is recommended that the 2241 Petition be dismissed without prejudice and without requiring the Respondent to file an answer or return. Objections to R&R due by 8/16/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 8/1/2019. (gpre, ) Modified on 8/5/2019 to edit text (gpre, ).
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk, directing respondent not to answer and directing the petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 8/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Petition)(gpre, )
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 8/2/2019.(gpre, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Kamau Bailey. Response to Motion due by 8/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Inquiry, #2 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(gpre, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #5 Proper Form Order, AO240 Application, 2241 Petition court form, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Kamau Bailey 08191-068 FCI Estill PO Box 699 Estill, SC 29918 (gpre, )
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPER FORM ORDER directing Plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Case to be brought into proper form by 7/18/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 6/27/2019. (gpre, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Beaufort. (gpre, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kamau Bailey. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A Sentencing Transcripts, #2 Appendix B Opinion and Order of 2255 Denial, #3 Appendix C Sentenceing Transcripts State Drug Offense, #4 Appendix D Denial of second or Successive Motin under 28 U.S.C. 2255(h), #5 Cover Letter, #6 Envelope)(gpre, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/19/2019: #7 2241 Petition on court form, #8 Envelope) (gpre, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bailey v. Mackelburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden W E Mackelburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kamau Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?