Redding v. Standard Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Pamela Redding
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv01873
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #7 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Harold P. WelbornPO Box 215Pickens, SC 29671-0215 with copy of NEF (sfla, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED #7 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, to pwelborn@co.pickens.sc.us (sfla)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 OPINION and ORDER granting #6 Consent Motion to Remand to State Court and barring Plaintiff from recovering a total amount of actual and punitive damages exceeding $75000 exclusive of interest and costs. Clerk's Notice: Attorneys are responsible for supplementing the State Record with all documents filed in Federal Court. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 7/22/19.(sfla)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT MOTION to Remand to State Court South Carolina by Pamela Redding. Response to Motion due by 7/29/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Segura, James) Modified on 7/16/2019 to change "First" to "CONSENT" (sfla).
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint (Response to Motion due by 7/15/2019), MOTION to Strike Jury Demand by Standard Insurance Company. (sfla)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Standard Insurance Company.(sfla)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Standard Insurance Company. (sfla)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pickens County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-39-577. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8533491) filed by Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(sfla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redding v. Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael T Brittingham
Represented By: James T Hedgepath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Redding
Represented By: James W Segura
Represented By: Paul E Hammack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?