AnMed Health v. BlueChoice HealthPlan of South Carolina Inc
Plaintiff: AnMed Health
Defendant: BlueChoice HealthPlan of South Carolina Inc
Case Number: 8:2019cv01894
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 8/13/19. (sfla)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Settlement by AnMed Health (Bax, Nathaniel)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by AnMed Health. BlueChoice HealthPlan of South Carolina Inc served on 7/9/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance of Service)(Bax, Nathaniel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to BlueChoice HealthPlan of South Carolina Inc. (sfla)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by AnMed Health.(sfla)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BlueChoice HealthPlan of South Carolina Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8538809) filed by AnMed Health. Service due by 10/1/2019(sfla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AnMed Health v. BlueChoice HealthPlan of South Carolina Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BlueChoice HealthPlan of South Carolina Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AnMed Health
Represented By: Nathaniel W Bax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?