Redding v. Protective Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Pamela Redding
Defendant: Protective Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv01909
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENT E-MAILED #10 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, to Pickens County Court of Common Pleas Clerk of Court (alew, )
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Remand to State Court. Clerk's Notice: Attorneys are responsible for supplementing the State Record with all documents filed in Federal Court. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 8/14/19.(alew, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 8/14/19.(alew, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to Remand to State Court by Protective Life Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 8/27/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Executed Stipulation Limiting Plaintiff's Damages, #2 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Barker, Rita)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Response to Motion due by 8/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 7/24/19.(alew, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Pamela Redding. Response to Motion due by 8/6/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Hammack, Paul)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Protective Life Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 7/23/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit A-ER Abstract Summary Form, #3 Exhibit Local Rule 7.05(C)(2) Unpublished Decisions/Decisions Not Readily Available)No proposed order.(Barker, Rita) Modified on 7/10/2019 to add exhibit description provided by filing user (alew, ).
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Protective Life Insurance Company.(abuc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pickens County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-39-00575. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8539196), filed by Protective Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Redding v. Protective Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protective Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Rita Bolt Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Redding
Represented By: James W Segura
Represented By: Paul E Hammack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?