Macon v. Dixie Power
Plaintiff: Joseph E Macon and Joe E Macon
Defendant: Dixie Power Elec Company and Duke Power
Case Number: 8:2019cv01933
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Duke Power re #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #21 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories, #20 Answer to Complaint (Spencer, Joshua)
August 28, 2019 Filing 23 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #22 Roseboro Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Joseph E Macon 102 Blair Mill Road Belton, SC 29627 (gpre, )
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ROSEBORO ORDER directing clerk to forward summary judgment explanation to the opposing party and directing that party to respond in 31 days. Response to #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM due by 9/30/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 8/28/2019. (gpre, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 21 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Duke Power.(Spencer, Joshua)
August 27, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Duke Power.(Spencer, Joshua)
August 27, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Duke Power. Response to Motion due by 9/10/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit to Memorandum)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Spencer, Joshua)
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed Duke Power served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (gpre, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Duke Power. Service due by 10/28/2019 (gpre, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #14 Order Service - Non-Inmate, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Joseph E Macon 102 Blair Mill Road Belton, SC 29627 (gpre, )
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk and directing plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. United States Marshals shall serve the Complaint on Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D. Austin on 7/30/2019. (gpre, ) Modified on 7/31/2019 to edit text (gpre, ).
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 Pro Se Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Joseph E Macon.(gpre, )
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, referenced in #7 Proper Form Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 7/11/2019.(gpre, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #7 Proper Form Order, 12 Text Order, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Joseph E Macon 102 Blair Mill Road Belton, SC 29627 with blank summons, USM285 form, 26.01 pro se interrogatories as directed. (kric, ) Modified on 7/30/2019 to add text order referenced in Proper Form Order (gpre, ).
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 8/1/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 7/11/2019. (kric, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Joseph E Macon. Response to Motion due by 7/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(gpre, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dixie Power, filed by Joseph E Macon. Service due by 10/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(gpre, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Macon v. Dixie Power
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph E Macon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe E Macon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixie Power Elec Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Power
Represented By: Joshua D Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?