Lesemann v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Henry S Lesemann, III
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Interested Party: Social Security Administration Record
Case Number: 8:2019cv01961
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henry S Lesemann, III. Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 7/25/2019, pursuant to Local Rule 83.VII.03 answer due 11/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Certified Mail Receipts)(Jung, William)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 7/16/19.(jsmi, )
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner Social Security Administration. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attorney General, #2 Summons SSA)(jsmi, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Henry S Lesemann, III. Response to Motion due by 7/26/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(jsmi, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner Social Security Administration Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website., filed by Henry S Lesemann, III. Service due by 10/10/2019(jsmi, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lesemann v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry S Lesemann, III
Represented By: William B Jung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration Record
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?