Webb v. SavaSeniorCare LLC et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Webb
Defendant: SSC Seneca Operating Company LLC, SavaSeniorCare LLC, SSC Equity Holdings LLC, SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services LLC and SavaSeniorCare Consulting LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv02167
Filed: August 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Filing 20 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by SSC Seneca Operating Company LLC.(Davis, Donald)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER; Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/18/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/17/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/18/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/17/2020, Discovery due by 6/19/2020, Motion in Limine due by 10/6/2020, Motions due by 7/2/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 9/18/2020, Pretrial Briefs due by 10/13/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 10/20/2020. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 9/17/19. (sfla)
September 17, 2019 Filing 18 MEDIATION ORDER; Mediation Due by 6/26/2020. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 9/17/19. (sfla)
September 16, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by SSC Equity Holdings LLC, SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services LLC, SavaSeniorCare Consulting LLC, SavaSeniorCare LLC. (Davis, Donald)
September 16, 2019 Filing 15 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Patricia Webb.(Burnett, Jennifer)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by SSC Equity Holdings LLC, SSC Seneca Operating Company LLC, SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services LLC, SavaSeniorCare Consulting LLC, SavaSeniorCare LLC.(Davis, Donald)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Patricia Webb.(Burnett, Jennifer)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: \ Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/29/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/12/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 9/12/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/18/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/17/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/18/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/18/2020, Discovery due by 3/19/2020, Motion in Limine due by 6/2/2020, Motions due by 4/2/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/15/2020, Pretrial Briefs due by 6/9/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 6/16/2020. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 8/9/19. (sfla)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by SavaSeniorCare Consulting LLC.(Davis, Donald)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services LLC.(Davis, Donald)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by SSC Seneca Operating Company LLC.(Davis, Donald)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by SSC Equity Holdings LLC.(Davis, Donald)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by SavaSeniorCare LLC.(Davis, Donald)
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 Individual CONSENTs TO REMOVAL FROM STATE COURT by SavaSeniorCare LLC, SSC Equity Holdings LLC, SSC Seneca Operating Company LLC, SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services LLC, SavaSeniorCare Consulting LLC. (sfla)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Individual Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories filed by each defendant: by SavaSeniorCare LLC, SSC Equity Holdings LLC, SSC Seneca Operating Company LLC, SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services LLC, SavaSeniorCare Consulting LLC.(sfla)
August 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oconee County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-37-388. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8593883) filed by SavaSeniorCare LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(sfla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. SavaSeniorCare LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Webb
Represented By: Jennifer Spragins Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Seneca Operating Company LLC
Represented By: Donald Jay Davis, Jr
Represented By: Kate Cammerer Mettler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SavaSeniorCare LLC
Represented By: Donald Jay Davis, Jr
Represented By: Kate Cammerer Mettler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Equity Holdings LLC
Represented By: Donald Jay Davis, Jr
Represented By: Kate Cammerer Mettler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services LLC
Represented By: Donald Jay Davis, Jr
Represented By: Kate Cammerer Mettler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SavaSeniorCare Consulting LLC
Represented By: Donald Jay Davis, Jr
Represented By: Kate Cammerer Mettler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?