Moss v. Dobbs
Petitioner: Dwight E Moss
Respondent: Warden B Dobbs
Case Number: 8:2019cv02280
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: J Michelle Childs
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re 14 Document Mailed served on Attorney General of the United States on 10/1/2019. (gpre, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED certified #70153430000072763345 #11 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Attorney General of the United States (gpre, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #11 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer, #12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus mailed from Greenville Clerks Office to Dwight E Moss 76847-004 WILLIAMSBURG FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 340 SALTERS, SC 29590 (gpre, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommended #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be dismissed without prejudice and without requiring Respondent to file an answer or return. Objections to R&R due by 10/7/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 9/23/2019. (gpre, )
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk, directing respondent not to answer. Petitioner has paid the full filing fee of $5 (receipt number SCX600008394). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 9/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Petition)(gpre, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 Filing fee: PAID $ 5, receipt number SCX600008394 (gpre, )
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Letter from Dwight Moss regarding filing fee. Form submitted to the institution for $5 fee to be taken from account. (Attachment(s) #1 Envelope) (gpre,)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #5 Proper Form Order, AO240 application, 2241 Habeas form, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Dwight E Moss 76847-004 WILLIAMSBURG FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 340 SALTERS, SC 29590 (gpre, )
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPER FORM ORDER directing Plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Case to be brought into proper form by 9/10/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 8/20/2019. (gpre, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Florence. (gpre, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Dwight E Moss. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Supporting Documents, #3 Envelope)(gpre, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2019: #4 Petition on court form, #5 Envelope) (gpre, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moss v. Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dwight E Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden B Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?