Rossi v. Progressive Investment Concepts Inc et al
Plaintiff: Paul S Rossi, III
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc, Trans Union LLC, Progressive Investment Concepts Inc, Santander Consumer USA Holdings Inc. and Equifax Information Services LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv02294
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 25 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER; Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 2/5/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 3/6/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 4/7/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/7/2020, Discovery due by 5/7/2020, Motion in Limine due by 7/21/2020, Motions due by 5/21/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/3/2020, Pretrial Briefs due by 7/28/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 8/4/2020. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 9/25/19. (sfla) Modified on 9/30/2019 to correct motions to amend pleadings due date and conform to order. (sfla).
September 25, 2019 Filing 24 MEDIATION ORDER; Mediation Due by 5/14/2020. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 9/25/19. (sfla)
September 24, 2019 Filing 22 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Zwing Bryant, Lyndey)
September 24, 2019 Filing 21 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Paul S Rossi, III. (Attachments: #1 26(f) Discovery Plan, #2 Proposed Order)(Maxfield, David) (Main Document 21 replaced on 9/25/2019 with corrected document provided by filing user; description of Attachment 1 corrected) (sfla).
September 24, 2019 Filing 20 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Paul S Rossi, III.(Maxfield, David)
September 24, 2019 Filing 19 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Progressive Investment Concepts Inc.(McCall, Crystal)
September 24, 2019 Filing 18 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Trans Union LLC.(Johnson, Wilbur)
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Enter Rubin Order as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Only by Paul S Rossi, III (Maxfield, David)
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Barker, Rita)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/11/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/25/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 9/25/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/18/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/17/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/18/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/18/2020, Discovery due by 3/19/2020, Motion in Limine due by 6/2/2020, Motions due by 4/2/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/15/2020, Pretrial Briefs due by 6/9/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 6/16/2020. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 8/22/19. (sfla)
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Zwing Bryant, Lyndey)
August 21, 2019 Filing 10 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Progressive Investment Concepts Inc.(McCall, Crystal)
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 Progressive Investment Concepts, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Progressive Investment Concepts Inc. (McCall, Crystal)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Johnson, Wilbur) (Main Document 8 replaced on 8/22/2019) (alew, ). Modified on 8/22/2019 to replace with corrected document per attorney request (alew, ).
August 19, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Equifax Information Services LLC answer due 9/20/2019. Entered by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on August 19, 2019. (bedw)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Equifax Information Services LLC. Response to Motion due by 9/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Barker, Rita)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Experian Information Solutions Inc.(Zwing Bryant, Lyndey)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Paul S Rossi.(Maxfield, David)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Trans Union LLC.(sfla)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pickens County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019-CP-39-897. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8615430) filed by Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Addendum Joinders In and Consents to Removal)(sfla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rossi v. Progressive Investment Concepts Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc
Represented By: Lyndey Ritz Zwing Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Wilbur Eugene Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Investment Concepts Inc
Represented By: William Stevens Brown
Represented By: Crystal M McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santander Consumer USA Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Rita Bolt Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul S Rossi, III
Represented By: David Andrew Maxfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?