KMI of Easley LLC v. WJH LLC
Plaintiff: KMI of Easley LLC
Defendant: WJH LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv02341
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE for 11/20/2019 03:00 PM in Spartanburg 2nd Floor, Donald S Russell Fed Bldg, 201 Magnolia St, Spartanburg before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 10/9/2019. (abuc)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/29/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/23/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/17/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/18/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/9/2020, Discovery due by 4/6/2020, Motion in Limine due by 6/5/2020, Motions due by 4/20/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 6/15/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 7/6/2020, Mediation Due by 5/4/2020, Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 10/9/2019. (abuc)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by WJH LLC.(McCarrell, Michael)
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by WJH LLC.(McCarrell, Michael)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Kevin McCarrell on behalf of WJH LLC (McCarrell, Michael)
September 30, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by WJH LLC. (McCarrell, Michael)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KMI of Easley LLC. WJH LLC served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Burke, Luke)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to WJH LLC. (abuc)
August 19, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by KMI of Easley LLC.(abuc) Modified to correct date filed on 8/20/2019 (abuc).
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WJH LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8623495.), filed by KMI of Easley LLC. Service due by 11/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Trade Partner Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Vendor Service Agreement)(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KMI of Easley LLC v. WJH LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KMI of Easley LLC
Represented By: Luke Anthony Burke
Represented By: Oscar William Bannister, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WJH LLC
Represented By: Michael Kevin McCarrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?