Crane v. Greenwood City Police Dept
Plaintiff: Tracy Lee Crane
Defendant: Greenwood City Police Dept
Case Number: 8:2019cv02634
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 18 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #14 Amended Complaint filed by Tracy Lee Crane, #16 Order - 1983 - No Service placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Tracy Lee Crane Hill Finkley Detention Center 300 California Avenue Moncks Corner, SC 29461 (gpre, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION it is recommended that the District Court dismiss this action without leave to amend and without issuance and service of process. Objections to R&R due by 12/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 11/15/2019. (gpre, )
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 11/15/2019. (gpre, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Greenwood City Police Dept, filed by Tracy Lee Crane. Service due by 2/3/2020 (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(gpre, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #11 Proper Form Order, 10 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #12 Order Regarding Amendment, Court's complaint form, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Tracy Lee Crane Hill Finkley Detention Center 300 California Avenue Moncks Corner, SC 29461 (gpre, )
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING AMENDMENT Plaintiff is granted twenty-one (21) days from the date this order is entered (plus three days for mail time) to file an amended complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a) that corrects the deficiencies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 10/9/2019. (gpre, )
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SECOND PROPER FORM ORDER Plaintiff's attention is directed to the Order Regarding Amendment filed contemporaneously with this Order. Case to be brought into proper form by 10/30/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 10/9/2019. (gpre, )
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 10/9/2019.(gpre, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Tracy Lee Crane. Response to Motion due by 10/18/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(gpre, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #5 Proper Form Order, AO-240 application, summons form, USM-285 form, Court's complaint form placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Tracy Lee Crane Hill Finkley Detention Center 300 California Avenue Moncks Corner, SC 29461 (gpre, )
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPER FORM ORDER directing Plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Case to be brought into proper form by 10/15/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 9/24/2019. (gpre, )
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Anderson/Greenwood. (gpre, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Greenwood City Police Dept, filed by Tracy Lee Crane. Service due by 12/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(gpre, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crane v. Greenwood City Police Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Lee Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwood City Police Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?