Moss v. Hutchens Law Firm et al
Plaintiff: Stanley Moss
Defendant: Novastar Mortgage, MERS, US Bank and National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust, Fay Servicing LLC, Hutchens Law Firm and Ashley Z Stanley
Case Number: 8:2019cv02651
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 20 OBJECTION to #15 Report and Recommendation by Stanley Moss. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(abuc)
October 15, 2019 Filing 19 Letter from Stanley Moss. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(abuc)
October 15, 2019 Filing 18 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 17 Transfer of Case Management placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Stanley Moss 603 Grenleaf Drive Anderson, SC 29626 (gpre, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 17 ***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Donald C. Coggins. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: 300 East Washington Street, Greenville SC 29601. (gpre, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 16 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 13 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #14 Order placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Stanley Moss 603 Grenleaf Drive Anderson, SC 29626 (gpre, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION it is recommended that the Complaint be summarily DISMISSED this action without leave to amend and without issuance andservice of process. Objections to R&R due by 10/29/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 10/15/2019. (gpre, )
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 10/15/2019. (gpre, )
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 10/15/2019.(gpre, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT by Stanley Moss to #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(gpre, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint, by Stanley Moss. Response to Motion due by 10/22/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(gpre, ) Supplement #10 filed 10/10/2019 (gpre, ).
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Anderson/Greenwood. (gpre, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Stanley Moss. Response to Motion due by 10/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(gpre, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Pro Se Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Stanley Moss.(gpre, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fay Servicing LLC, Hutchens Law Firm, MERS, Novastar Mortgage, Ashley Z Stanley, US Bank and National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust, filed by Stanley Moss. Service due by 12/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(gpre, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moss v. Hutchens Law Firm et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novastar Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank and National Association as Legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 SC6 Title Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hutchens Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Z Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?