Patel v. Electrolux Home Products Inc
Plaintiff: Samir Patel
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products Inc
Case Number: 8:2019cv02860
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Referring Judge: Kevin McDonald
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 15 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 4/2/2020, Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 11/25/2019. (kric, )
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witness due by 1/27/20, Defendant's ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/25/20, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/26/20, Discovery due by 3/26/20, Motions due by 4/9/20, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 6/1/20, Jury Selection Deadline 7/1/20. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 11/13/19. (ctuc, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Samir Patel.(Summerlin, Jeremy)
November 13, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Electrolux Home Products Inc.(Cantey, Nicole)
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by Electrolux Home Products Inc, Samir Patel. (Cantey, Nicole) Modified on 11/13/2019 to edit filers and text (kric, ).
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 Joint Rule 26(f) Report by Electrolux Home Products Inc, Samir Patel . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cantey, Nicole) Modified on 11/13/2019 to edit filers and text (kric, ).
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 10/30/2019, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 11/13/2019, Rule 26 Report due by 11/13/2019, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/27/2019, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/27/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/25/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/25/2020, Discovery due by 3/26/2020, Motions due by 4/9/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 6/1/2020, Jury Selection Deadline 7/1/2020, Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 10/10/2019. (kric, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Samir Patel.(Summerlin, Jeremy)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Electrolux Home Products Inc.(Cantey, Nicole) (Main Document 5 replaced on 10/9/2019 with corrected document at request of counsel) (kric, ).
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff's LR26.01 interrogatories are due by 10/21/2019 (kric, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Electrolux Home Products Inc.(kric, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Anderson County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019CP. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8714575), filed by Electrolux Home Products Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(kric, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patel v. Electrolux Home Products Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electrolux Home Products Inc
Represented By: C Frederick W Manning, II
Represented By: Nicole Paul Cantey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samir Patel
Represented By: Jeremy Randall Summerlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?