United States of America v. 53950 dollars in US Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 53950 dollars in US Currency
Claimant: Tirrell Lamont Freeman
Case Number: 8:2020cv00651
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Filing 13 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 03/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Advertisement Certification Report)(Sherard, Carrie)
March 8, 2020 Filing 10 CLAIM to seized currency by Tirrell Lamont Freeman. (Moorhead, John) (Main Document 10 replaced on 3/9/2020: to replace with corrected document (cover page signed by filing attorney) provided by filing attorney). (Additional attachment added on 3/9/2020: #1 Claim) (kmca).
March 8, 2020 Filing 9 Claimant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Tirrell Lamont Freeman.(Moorhead, John)
March 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John Kirkman Moorhead on behalf of Tirrell Lamont Freeman (Moorhead, John)
February 19, 2020 Filing 7 WARRANT Returned Executed as to $53,950 in USC. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Warrant for Arrest of Articles in Rem)(Sherard, Carrie)
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Judicial Forfeiture Action by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sherard, Carrie) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/19/2020: to replace with corrected document (number typo and clerk's address) as provided by filing user) (kmca).
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 WARRANT IN REM ISSUED (kmca)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 APPLICATION FOR WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM by United States of America. (kmca)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 53950 dollars in US Currency, filed by United States of America. Service due by 5/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verification)(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 53950 dollars in US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 53950 dollars in US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Carrie Fisher Sherard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Tirrell Lamont Freeman
Represented By: John Kirkman Moorhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?