Battery Dynamics Group LLC v. One World Technologies Inc
Plaintiff: Battery Dynamics Group LLC
Defendant: One World Technologies Inc
Case Number: 8:2020cv00793
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Albert P. Allan for the plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 3/26/20.(alew, )
March 20, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Albert P. Allan by Battery Dynamics Group LLC. Response to Motion due by 4/3/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application/Affidavit, #2 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order.(White, Kyle) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/26/2020: #3 NC Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing) (alew, ). Modified on 3/26/2020 to add corrected document provided by filing user(alew, ).
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (alew, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to One World Technologies Inc. (alew, )
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Battery Dynamics Group LLC.(alew, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/21/2020) (alew, ). Modified on 2/21/2020 to replace with corrected document per clerk (alew, ).
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against One World Technologies Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8958143.), filed by Battery Dynamics Group LLC. Service due by 5/20/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - United States Patent No. US 8,224,597 B2, (7/17/12)(alew, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Battery Dynamics Group LLC v. One World Technologies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Battery Dynamics Group LLC
Represented By: Kyle Jason White
Represented By: Albert P Allan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One World Technologies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?