Capital Homebuilders LLC v. RT Bailey Construction Inc et al
Plaintiff: Capital Homebuilders LLC
Defendant: RT Bailey Construction Inc and Robert T Bailey
Case Number: 8:2020cv01180
Filed: March 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING Pretrial Conference. Conference set for Tuesday, 7/21/2020 11:00 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 5/14/20. (alew, )
May 14, 2020 Filing 12 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/3/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/28/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/24/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/21/2020, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/13/2020, Discovery due by 11/10/2020, Motion in Limine due by 1/11/2021, Motions due by 11/24/2020, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 1/18/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 2/8/2021, Mediation Due by 12/8/2020. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 5/14/20. (alew, )
May 12, 2020 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Robert T Bailey, RT Bailey Construction Inc.(Killen, Craig)
May 12, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by RT Bailey Construction Inc.(Killen, Craig)
May 12, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Robert T Bailey.(Killen, Craig)
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER Robert T Bailey answer due 5/12/2020; RT Bailey Construction Inc answer due 5/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Email granting extension)(Lightsey, Wallace)
April 6, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capital Homebuilders LLC. Robert T Bailey served on 3/31/2020, answer due 4/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service- Robert Bailey)(Lightsey, Wallace)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capital Homebuilders LLC. RT Bailey Construction Inc served on 3/31/2020, answer due 4/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service - RT Bailey Construction)(Lightsey, Wallace)
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (alew, )
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Robert T Bailey, RT Bailey Construction Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons RT Bailey Construction Inc)(alew, )
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Capital Homebuilders LLC.(alew, )
March 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert T Bailey, RT Bailey Construction Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9022722.), filed by Capital Homebuilders LLC. Service due by 6/24/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Infringing Houses)(alew, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capital Homebuilders LLC v. RT Bailey Construction Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RT Bailey Construction Inc
Represented By: Craig N Killen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert T Bailey
Represented By: Craig N Killen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capital Homebuilders LLC
Represented By: Meliah Bowers Jefferson
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?