Barfield v. Meetz
Plaintiff: John L Barfield
Defendant: Vickeery Meetz
Case Number: 8:2020cv02634
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Prison:Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 15 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #14 Judgment, #13 Order on Report and Recommendation placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to John L Barfield 17849 Florence County Detention Center 6719 Friendfield Road Effingham, SC 29541 (rweb, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 14 JUDGMENT, this action is DISMISSED without leave to amend andwithout issuance and service of process. (rweb, )
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER affirming #9 Report and Recommendation, dismissing action without leave to amend and without issuance and service of process. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 8/18/2020.(eric, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #8 Order - 1983 - No Service, #9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint filed by John L Barfield placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to John L Barfield 17849 Florence County Detention Center 6719 Friendfield Road Effingham, SC 29541 (rweb, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION it is recommended that the District Court DISMISS this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and 1915A without leave to amend and without issuance and service of process. Further, it is recommended that the dismissal be counted as a strike pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Objections to R&R due by 8/4/2020 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 07/21/2020. (rweb, )
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing Clerk not to authorize service and advising plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 7/21/20. (rweb, )
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 07/21/2020.(rweb, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Florence. (rweb, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by John L Barfield. Response to Motion due by 7/30/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin. (rweb, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vickeery Meetz, filed by John L Barfield. Service due by 10/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (rweb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barfield v. Meetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John L Barfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vickeery Meetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?