Dooley v. Publix Super Markets Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ruth Dooley
Defendant: Publix Asset Management Company and Publix Super Markets Inc
Case Number: 8:2020cv02990
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 12 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/23/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 10/7/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 10/7/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/8/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/8/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/10/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/10/2021, Discovery due by 4/9/2021, Motion in Limine due by 6/23/2021, Motions due by 4/23/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 6/7/2021, Pretrial Briefs due by 6/30/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 7/7/2021, Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 9/3/2020. (abuc)
September 2, 2020 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Ruth Dooley.(Bradley, Timothy)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff is directed to file their Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories no later than 9/3/2020. (abuc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Publix Super Markets Inc. (abuc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Publix Asset Management Company. (abuc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Publix Super Markets Inc.(abuc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Publix Asset Management Company.(abuc) (Main Document 5 replaced on 8/20/2020) (abuc, ).
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Publix Asset Management Company.(abuc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Publix Super Markets Inc.(abuc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Anderson County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-04-01352. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9287994), filed by Publix Asset Management Company, Publix Super Markets Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents)(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dooley v. Publix Super Markets Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Publix Asset Management Company
Represented By: Steven J Pugh
Represented By: Robert Wilder Harte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Publix Super Markets Inc
Represented By: Steven J Pugh
Represented By: Robert Wilder Harte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Dooley
Represented By: Timothy Matthew Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?