Wright v. Warden of Edgefield Federal Correctional Institution
Petitioner: James L. Wright
Respondent: United States of America and Warden of Edgefield Federal Correctional Institution
Case Number: 8:2021cv00388
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Joseph Dawson
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Filing 13 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED CERTIFIED Receipt #9490 9118 9556 0120 0247 77 #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #10 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to United States Attorney General 950 Pennsylvania Avenue NW Washington DC 20530. (sgri)
April 1, 2021 Filing 12 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #10 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to James L. Wright 48432-018 EDGEFIELD FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 725 EDGEFIELD, SC 29824. (sgri)
March 31, 2021 Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION It is recommended that the 2241 Petition #1 be DISMISSED without prejudice and without requiring the Respondent to file an answer or return. Objections to R&R due by 4/14/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 3/31/2021. (sgri)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk, directing respondent not to answer and directing the petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D. Austin on 3/31/2021. (sgri)
March 5, 2021 Filing 8 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number SCX600008829 (gpre, )
February 9, 2021 Filing 6 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #5 Proper Form Order, AO 240, 2241, and original petition placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to James L. Wright 48432-018 EDGEFIELD FEDERAL CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION Inmate Mail/Parcels P.O. BOX 725 EDGEFIELD, SC 29824. (sgri)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 3/2/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D. Austin on 2/9/2021. (sgri)
February 8, 2021 Filing 3 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: Anderson/Greenwood. (gpre, )
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Filed by James L. Wright. (Attachments: #1 UNICOR Employment Records, #2 BOP Education Record, #3 Request To Warden Phelps, #4 Notice of Filing Fee Payment) (sgri) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/8/2021: #5 Envelope) (gpre, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/3/2021: #6 Petition, #7 Petition for Writ 12-cr-70, #8 UNICOR Employment Records, #9 BOP Education Record, #10 Envelope) (sgri).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Warden of Edgefield Federal Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James L. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of Edgefield Federal Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?