Fowler v. SSC Seneca Operating Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tammy Fowler
Defendant: SavaSeniorCare LLC, SSC Equity Holdings LLC, SSC Seneca Operating Company LLC doing business as Seneca Health and Rehabilitation Center, SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services LLC and SavaSeniorCare Consulting LLC
Case Number: 8:2021cv00430
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Henry M Herlong
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Response filed by SSC Seneca Operating Company LLC. (Gandy, James)
April 1, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Compel Arbitration, MOTION to Stay. Response filed by Tammy Fowler. Reply to Response to Motion due by 4/8/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Resident Admission Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Dispute Resolution Program)(Feidler, Stefan) Modified on 4/1/2021: to correct linkage ( #16 ) (kmca). Modified on 4/2/2021: to add descriptions to exhibit as provided by filing user (kmca).
March 17, 2021 Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #16 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Compel Arbitration and/or MOTION to Stay. Response to Motion due by 4/2/2021. Entered at the direction of Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 3/17/21. (sfla)
March 17, 2021 Filing 20 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss and MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay by Tammy Fowler. Response to Motion due by 3/31/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Feidler, Stefan)
March 15, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Stay by SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services LLC. Response to Motion due by 3/29/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Gandy, James)
March 15, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay by SavaSeniorCare Consulting LLC. Response to Motion due by 3/29/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)No proposed order.(Gandy, James)
March 5, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Compel Arbitration, and MOTION to Stay Deadlines ( Response to Motion due by 3/19/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. ) by SSC Seneca Operating Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Arbitration Agreement, #3 Exhibit 2 - Resident Admission Agreements, #4 Exhibit 3 - Other Written Consents, #5 Exhibit 4 - McCutcheon Order)No proposed order.(Gandy, James). Added MOTION to Stay on 3/8/2021: to add additional relief listed (kmca).
February 17, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by SavaSeniorCare LLC.(Davis, Donald)
February 17, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by SavaSeniorCare Consulting LLC.(Davis, Donald)
February 17, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services LLC.(Davis, Donald)
February 17, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by SSC Equity Holdings LLC.(Davis, Donald)
February 17, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by SSC Seneca Operating Company LLC.(Davis, Donald)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 3/9/2021, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 3/23/2021, Rule 26 Report due by 3/23/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 5/3/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 6/2/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 7/2/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 7/2/2021, Discovery due by 8/2/2021, Motions due by 8/16/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 10/4/2021, Motion in Limine due by 10/20/2021, Pretrial Briefs due by 10/27/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 11/3/2021. Signed by Honorable Henry M Herlong, Jr on 2/17/21. (kmca)
February 17, 2021 Filing 9 PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO LOCAL RULE 26.01 INTERROGATORIES Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tammy Fowler.(Feidler, Stefan) (Main Document 9 replaced on 2/17/2021: to replace with corrected document (answer to E) as provided by filing user) (kmca).
February 10, 2021 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by SavaSeniorCare Consulting LLC.(kmca)
February 10, 2021 Filing 6 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services LLC.(kmca)
February 10, 2021 Filing 5 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by SSC Equity Holdings LLC.(kmca)
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by SavaSeniorCare LLC.(kmca)
February 10, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by SSC Seneca Operating Company LLC.(kmca)
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oconee County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2020-CP-37-00838. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0420-9643941), filed by SSC Seneca Operating Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Receipt of Removal, #3 Savaseniorcare, LLC Consent to Removal, #4 Savaseniorcare Administrative Services, LLC Consent to Removal, #5 Savaseniorcare Consulting, LLC Consent to Removal, #6 SSC Equity Holdings, LLC Consent to Removal)(kmca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fowler v. SSC Seneca Operating Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Fowler
Represented By: Roy T Willey, IV
Represented By: Stefan B Feidler
Represented By: Eric Poulin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SavaSeniorCare LLC
Represented By: Donald Jay Davis, Jr
Represented By: James Dowell Gandy, III
Represented By: Gaillard T Dotterer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Equity Holdings LLC
Represented By: Donald Jay Davis, Jr
Represented By: James Dowell Gandy, III
Represented By: Gaillard T Dotterer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Seneca Operating Company LLC doing business as Seneca Health and Rehabilitation Center
Represented By: Donald Jay Davis, Jr
Represented By: James Dowell Gandy, III
Represented By: Gaillard T Dotterer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SavaSeniorCare Administrative Services LLC
Represented By: Donald Jay Davis, Jr
Represented By: James Dowell Gandy, III
Represented By: Gaillard T Dotterer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SavaSeniorCare Consulting LLC
Represented By: Donald Jay Davis, Jr
Represented By: James Dowell Gandy, III
Represented By: Gaillard T Dotterer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?