Wilson v. Anderson City Police Department, The et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Wilson
Defendant: Anderson City Police Department, The, Officer Joseph Chapman, Anderson County Sheriff's Office, The and B D Jackson
Case Number: 8:2021cv02253
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Donald C Coggins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING Pretrial Conference, Thursday, 9/9/21 @ 11:00am. cancelled and rescheduled to: Pretrial Conference set for Thursday, 12/9/2021 11:00 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Defendant's counsel Charles Turner is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. (alew, )
August 31, 2021 Filing 18 AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/25/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/17/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/17/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 4/6/2022, Discovery due by 5/6/2022, Motion in Limine due by 7/6/2022, Motions due by 5/23/2022, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/15/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 8/5/2022, Mediation Due by 6/7/2022. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 8/31/21. (alew, ) (Main Document 18 replaced on 8/31/2021) (alew, ). Modified on 8/31/2021 to replace with corrected document per clerk (alew, ).
August 31, 2021 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion to Amend/Correct #14 Conference and Scheduling Order. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 8/31/21.(alew, )
August 30, 2021 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #14 Scheduling Order,, by Anderson City Police Department, The, Joseph Chapman. Response to Motion due by 9/13/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Consent Amended Scheduling Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Logan, James) Modified on 8/31/2021 to edit text (alew, ).
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER AND NOTICE SETTING Pretrial Conference. Conference set for Thursday, 9/9/21 11:00 AM before Honorable Donald C Coggins Jr. Defendant's counsel Charles Turner is directed to arrange and initiate the conference call, conference in all other participating counsel, and then connect to chambers at 864-591-5340. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 8/9/21. (alew, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 14 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/30/2021, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/25/2021, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/17/2021, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/17/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/6/2022, Discovery due by 2/7/2022, Motion in Limine due by 4/6/2022, Motions due by 2/22/2022, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 4/15/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 5/6/2022, Mediation Due by 3/7/2022. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 8/9/21. (alew, )
August 5, 2021 Filing 13 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Gregory Wilson.(Clawson, Samuel)
August 3, 2021 Filing 12 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Anderson County Sheriff's Office, The, B D Jackson. (Turner, Charles) (Main Document 12 replaced on 8/4/2021) (alew, ). Modified on 8/4/2021 to replace with corrected document per attorney request, to edit text (alew, ).
July 28, 2021 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Joseph Chapman.(Logan, James)
July 28, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Joseph Chapman.(Logan, James)
July 27, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE and Acknowledgment of receipt of Notice of Removal by Clerk of Court for Anderson County. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Signed Acknowledgement of Receipt of Notice of Removal)(Turner, Charles)
July 27, 2021 Filing 8 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Anderson City Police Department, The.(Logan, James)
July 27, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Anderson City Police Department, The.(Logan, James)
July 27, 2021 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE: Plaintiff's Answers to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories are due 14 days after removal (8/6/21). (alew, )
July 23, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Anderson County Sheriff's Office, The, B D Jackson. (abuc)
July 23, 2021 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Anderson County Sheriff's Office, The, B D Jackson.(abuc)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Anderson County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021-CP-04-01166. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0420-997640), filed by Anderson County Sheriff's Office, The, B D Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Acceptance of Service)(abuc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Anderson City Police Department, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Wilson
Represented By: Christina Rae Fargnoli
Represented By: Samuel Richard Clawson, Jr
Represented By: Steven M Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson City Police Department, The
Represented By: James William Logan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Joseph Chapman
Represented By: James William Logan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson County Sheriff's Office, The
Represented By: Charles F Turner, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B D Jackson
Represented By: Charles F Turner, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?