Kennedy v. Warden of Perry Correctional Institution
Petitioner: John F. Kennedy
Respondent: State of S.C. and Warden of Perry Correctional Institution
Case Number: 8:2021cv02832
Filed: September 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Filing 27 OBJECTION to #15 Report and Recommendation by John F. Kennedy. Reply to Objections due by 11/8/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (sgri)
October 20, 2021 Filing 26 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 24 TEXT Order on Motion for Extension of Time placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to John F. Kennedy 358076 Q-3-A-114 Perry Correctional Institution 430 Oaklawn Road Pelzer, SC 29669 (sgri)
October 20, 2021 Filing 24 TEXT ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time. Objections due by 12/6/21. Signed by Honorable Timothy M. Cain on 10/20/2021. (sgri)
October 14, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to file objections to #15 Report and Recommendation by John F. Kennedy. Response to Motion due by 10/28/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) No proposed order. (sgri)
September 29, 2021 Filing 20 OBJECTION to #15 Report and Recommendation by John F. Kennedy. Reply to Objections due by 10/13/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (sgri)
September 27, 2021 Filing 19 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 18 TEXT Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to John F. Kennedy 358076 Q-3-A-114 Perry Correctional Institution 430 Oaklawn Road Pelzer, SC 29669 (sgri)
September 27, 2021 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER mooting #17 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioners motion was granted on 9/17/21 (ECF 13 ). Signed by Honorable Timothy M. Cain on 9/27/2021. (sgri)
September 22, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by John F. Kennedy. Response to Motion due by 10/6/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) No proposed order. (sgri)
September 17, 2021 Filing 16 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by John F. Kennedy, #10 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by John F. Kennedy, #14 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer, 13 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to John F. Kennedy 358076 Q-3-A-114 Perry Correctional Institution 430 Oaklawn Road Pelzer, SC 29669. (sgri)
September 17, 2021 Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION it is recommended that this action be dismissed without prejudice and without requiring the Respondent to file an answer or return. Objections to R&R due by 10/1/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D. Austin on 9/17/2021. (sgri)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk, directing respondent not to answer and directing the petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D. Austin on 9/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 2254 Writ of Habeas Corpus) (sgri)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D. Austin on 9/17/2021. (sgri)
September 13, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by John F. Kennedy. Response to Motion due by 9/27/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order. Motions referred to Jacquelyn D. Austin. (sgri)
September 13, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by John F. Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope, #3 Supporting Documents) (sgri)
September 8, 2021 Filing 9 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #7 Proper Form Order and AO 240 forms placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to John F. Kennedy #358076 Perry Correctional Institution Q-3-A-114 430 Oaklawn Road Pelzer, SC 29669 (sgri)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 9/29/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D. Austin on 9/8/2021. (sgri)
September 7, 2021 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: ANDERSON. (sgri)
September 2, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by John F. Kennedy. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 State Court Documents, #3 Cover Letter 2, #4 Envelope) (sgri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kennedy v. Warden of Perry Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John F. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of S.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden of Perry Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?