Norris v. Williams
Petitioner: Carnie Norris
Respondent: Charles Williams
Case Number: 8:2021cv03353
Filed: October 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Mary Geiger Lewis
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Filing 13 OBJECTION to #10 Report and Recommendation by Carnie Norris. Reply to Objections due by 11/17/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Attachments, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Envelope) (sgri)
October 28, 2021 Filing 12 Additional Attachments to Main Document #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. First attachment description: Appendix. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Letter from the Clerk's Office, #3 Envelope)(abuc)
October 19, 2021 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #8 Order - Habeas-Service-No Answer, 9 Order on Motion for Hearing, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Carnie Norris #227226 Perry Correctional Institution 430 Oaklawn Rd Pelzer, SC 29669 (sgri)
October 18, 2021 Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION it is recommended that this action #1 be dismissed without prejudice and without requiring the Respondent to file an answer or return. Objections to R&R due by 11/1/2021 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D. Austin on 10/18/2021. (sgri)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER denying #3 Motion for Hearing; denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D. Austin on 10/18/2021. (sgri)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER authorizing service of process by clerk, directing respondent not to answer and directing the petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. (Attachments: #1 2254 Writ of Habeas Corpus) Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D. Austin on 10/19/2021. (sgri)
October 15, 2021 Filing 5 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: GREENVILLE. (sgri)
October 14, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Hearing by Carnie Norris. Response to Motion due by 10/28/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) Proposed order is being emailed to chambers. Motions referred to Jacquelyn D. Austin. (sgri)
October 14, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Carnie Norris. Response to Motion due by 10/28/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Envelope) No proposed order. Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin. (sgri)
October 14, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 Receipt number SCX600008983.), filed by Carnie Norris. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Attachments, #3 Envelope) (sgri) (Main Document 1 replaced on 10/18/2021) (sgri). Additional attachments filed as separate entry #12 on 10/28/2021 (abuc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norris v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Carnie Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?