Lancaster v. Warden Perry Correctional Institution
Petitioner: Shannon M. Lancaster
Respondent: Warden Perry Correctional Institution
Case Number: 8:2021cv03591
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Jacquelyn D Austin
Referring Judge: Timothy M Cain
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2021 Filing 16 ***DOCUMENT MAILED 15 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Shannon M. Lancaster 341546 Perry Correctional Institution 430 Oaklawn Road Pelzer, SC 29669 (kric, )
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting respondent's #14 First motion for extension of time. Respondent's return is due on or before January 28, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 12/29/2021.(kric, )
December 29, 2021 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time by Warden Perry Correctional Institution. Response to Motion due by 1/12/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)No proposed order.Motions referred to Jacquelyn D Austin.(Maye, William)
November 9, 2021 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by Warden Perry Correctional Institution. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Brown, Melody)
November 9, 2021 Filing 11 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #10 Order 2254, placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Shannon M. Lancaster 341546 Perry Correctional Institution 430 Oaklawn Road Pelzer, SC 29669 (sgri)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER authorizing service of process. Apprising the respondents of deadline for filing dispositive motions and directing petitioner to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Return and Memorandum due by 12/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 2254 Writ of Habeas Corpus) Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 11/9/2021. (sgri)
November 8, 2021 Filing 8 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number SCX300096192 (sgri)
November 3, 2021 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENTS MAILED #6 Proper Form Order and AO 240 placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Shannon M. Lancaster 341546 Perry Correctional Institution 430 Oaklawn Road Pelzer, SC 29669 (sgri)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 11/29/2021. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 11/3/2021. (sgri)
November 2, 2021 Filing 2 TRUE DIVISION FOR TRIAL: ANDERSON. (sgri)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Shannon M. Lancaster. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Envelope) (sgri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lancaster v. Warden Perry Correctional Institution
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shannon M. Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Perry Correctional Institution
Represented By: William Joseph Maye
Represented By: Melody Jane Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?