v. Bluffton Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Joseph C Sun
Defendant: Bluffton Police Department, Jeffery A Dickson, Olesya Matyushevsky and Christine Varg
Case Number: 9:2009cv02050
Filed: August 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Beaufort Office
County: Beaufort
Presiding Judge: R Bryan Harwell
Presiding Judge: Bristow Marchant
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER adopting 141 Report and Recommendations granting 122 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 2/25/2011.(sshe, )
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 123 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant that this action be dismissed, with prejudice, in accordance with Rule 41(b), Fed.R.Civ.P. The Clerk shall mail this Report and Recommendation to Plaintiff at his last known address, as well as to Post Office Box 3893, Bluffton, South Carolina 29910. Objections to R&R due by 11/4/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 10/18/10. (rpol, )
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER ADOPTING 89 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, granting 43 MOTION to Dismiss by Citizens Opposing Domestic Abuse and Olesya Matyushevsky. These Defendants are dismissed as party Defendants in this case and Plaintiff's first cause of action is dismissed, in toto. Bluffton Police Department is dismissed as a party Defendant in this case. The MOTION to Dismiss 39 by Defendant Dickson is denied for the reasons stated in the R&R. The only remaining claim in this matter is Plaintiff's §1983 excessive force claim against Defendant Dickson. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 9/21/10.(rpol, )
January 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 25 Motion to Strike portions of amended complaint; denying 28 Motion to Amend/Correct; finding as moot 29 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and denying 30 Motion to Supplement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 1/25/10. (rpol, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: v. Bluffton Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph C Sun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluffton Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery A Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olesya Matyushevsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Varg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?