True Island Apparel LLC v. NHT LLC et al

Plaintiff: True Island Apparel LLC
Defendant: John C Miller and NHT LLC
Case Number: 9:2018cv02143
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Office: Beaufort Office
County: Beaufort
Presiding Judge: Richard M Gergel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by True Island Apparel LLC Affidavit of Service (Miller) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service (NHT, Inc.))(Kim, Douglas)
September 2, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against John C Miller, NHT LLC, filed by True Island Apparel LLC. Service due by 12/3/2018 (Kim, Douglas)
August 22, 2018 Filing 5 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. (sshe, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John C Miller, NHT LLC. (sshe, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by True Island Apparel LLC.(sshe, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John C Miller, NHT LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7924939.), filed by True Island Apparel LLC. Service due by 11/1/2018(sshe, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: True Island Apparel LLC v. NHT LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NHT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: True Island Apparel LLC
Represented By: Douglas W Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?