United States v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: United States
Defendant: Carothers Construction Inc and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 9:2018cv02534
Filed: September 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: Bruce Howe Hendricks
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to Stay and staying this case in full pending the parties' arbitration. The Court declines to address any issue regarding the locale for the arbitration hearing. IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 11/5/2018.(vdru, )
October 19, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Stay Under the Federal Arbitration Act Response filed by United States.Reply to Response to Motion due by 10/26/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Sutcliffe, Lindsay)
October 19, 2018 Filing 13 Plaintiff E&D Coatings, Inc.'s ANSWER to Counterclaim #7 by United States.(Sutcliffe, Lindsay)
October 15, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on Def Liberty Mutual)(Sutcliffe, Lindsay)
October 10, 2018 Filing 11 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Butler, Drew)
October 10, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company.(Butler, Drew)
October 9, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States. Carothers Construction Inc served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Sutcliffe, Lindsay) (Main Document 9 replaced on 10/12/2018) (alew, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/12/2018: #1 Affidavit of Service fas to Carother's Construction Inc c/o Registered Agent) (alew, ). Modified on 10/12/2018 to add corrected document provided by filing user (alew, ).
October 5, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Under the Federal Arbitration Act by Carothers Construction Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/19/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit Subcontract, #3 Exhibit Demand for Arbitration, #4 Exhibit E&D Answering Statement, #5 Exhibit Objection to Locale, #6 Exhibit Affidavit of Ben Logan, #7 Exhibit 2018.09.24 Email from AAA regarding rule on locale issue, #8 Exhibit AAA Rule 12B, #9 Exhibit SC Code 15-7-120, #10 Exhibit MCAS Beaufort information)No proposed order.(Beaver, Ryan)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 Carothers Construction, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Carothers Construction Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subcontract)(Beaver, Ryan)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Carothers Construction Inc. c/o Registered Agent Solutions, Inc., 1245 Plunkett Road Gulfport, MS 39503. (alew, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Carothers Construction Inc, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Carothers Construction Inc)(alew, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by United States.(alew, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carothers Construction Inc, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7998291.), filed by United States. Service due by 12/12/2018(alew, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Lindsay Angel Sutcliffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carothers Construction Inc
Represented By: Ryan Lee Beaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Drew Hamilton Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?