Bakala v. Krupa et al
Plaintiff: Zdenek Bakala
Defendant: Crowds on Demand LLC, Pavol Krupa and Adam Swart
Case Number: 9:2018cv02590
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of South Carolina
Presiding Judge: David C Norton
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #56 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/14/2019.(eric, )
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #55 Motion for Discovery Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 3/14/2019.(eric, )
March 14, 2019 Filing 56 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #15 Amended Complaint, #55 Consent MOTION for Discovery Schedule by Pavol Krupa. Response to Motion due by 3/28/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Motion for Extension of Time)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Robertson, Trudy)
March 14, 2019 Filing 55 Consent MOTION for Discovery Schedule by Crowds on Demand LLC, Adam Swart. Response to Motion due by 3/28/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Discovery Schedule)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Robertson, Trudy)
March 12, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of motion hearing held on 3-6-19, before Judge David C. Norton. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra Potocki, Telephone number/E-mail potockidebra@bellsouth.net. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties have 7 calendar days from the filing of the transcript to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction.. Redaction Request due 4/2/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/12/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/10/2019. (dpotocki, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 53 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zdenek Bakala. Pavol Krupa served on 2/27/2019, answer due 3/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service on Pavol Krupa)(Winn, Marshall)
March 6, 2019 Filing 52 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable David C Norton: Motion Hearing held on 3/6/2019 re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Crowds on Demand LLC, Adam Swart, #48 MOTION to Amend/Correct #36 Rico Case Statement - Supplement Rico Case Statement filed by Zdenek Bakala. Court Reporter Debbie Potocki. (cmur, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 51 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motions #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #48 MOTION to Amend/Correct #36 Rico Case Statement - Supplement Rico Case Statement : Motion Hearing set for Wednesday, 3/6/2019 at 11:00 AM in Hon. Sol Blatt, Jr., Courtroom, J. Waties Waring Judicial Cntr, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable David C Norton. Amended to add motion #48(jbry, )
February 28, 2019 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion re #48 MOTION to Amend/Correct #36 Rico Case Statement - Supplement Rico Case Statement Response filed by Zdenek Bakala. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marshall Winn)(Winn, Marshall)
February 27, 2019 Filing 49 RESPONSE in Opposition re #48 MOTION to Amend/Correct #36 Rico Case Statement - Supplement Rico Case Statement Response filed by Crowds on Demand LLC, Adam Swart.Reply to Response to Motion due by 3/6/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Robertson, Trudy)
February 26, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION to Amend/Correct #36 Rico Case Statement - Supplement Rico Case Statement by Zdenek Bakala. Response to Motion due by 3/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Rico Case Statement)No proposed order.(Winn, Marshall)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Motion by Andrew J. M. Bentz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 2/7/2019.(jbry, )
February 6, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew J. M. Bentz ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8255221) by Zdenek Bakala. Response to Motion due by 2/20/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew J M Bentz, #2 Certificate of Good Standing for Andrew J M Bentz, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Winn, Marshall)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #42 Motion by Carl Richard Hennies to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 2/5/2019.(jbry, )
February 5, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING on Motion #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, 2/26/2019 at 11:00 AM cancelled and rescheduled to: Motion Hearing set for Wednesday, 3/6/2019 at 11:00 AM in Hon. Sol Blatt, Jr., Courtroom, J. Waties Waring Judicial Cntr, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable David C Norton. (jbry, )
February 4, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Carl Richard Hennies ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8248817) by Zdenek Bakala. Response to Motion due by 2/19/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application for Admission PHV of Carl Hennies, #2 Certificate of Good Standing for Carl R Hennies, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Winn, Marshall)
January 28, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Motion Hearing set for Tuesday, 2/26/2019 at 11:00 AM before Honorable David C Norton. (jbry, )
January 21, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE in Support re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Crowds on Demand LLC, Adam Swart. (Robertson, Trudy)
January 16, 2019 Filing 39 Summons Reissued as to Pavol Krupa. (jbry, )
January 7, 2019 Filing 38 Letter from Marshall Winn. (Winn, Marshall)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #34 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. ORDERED that the page number limitation shall be extended to 40 pages; and the deadline for Defendants Adam Swaii and Crowds on Demand LLC to reply to Plaintiff Zdenek Bakala's memorandum in opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss shall be extended through and including January 21, 2019. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 1/7/2019.(jbry, )
January 5, 2019 Filing 36 RICO CASE STATEMENT by Zdenek Bakala. (Lightsey, Wallace)
January 5, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response filed by Zdenek Bakala.Reply to Response to Motion due by 1/14/2019 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Lightsey, Wallace)
January 4, 2019 Filing 34 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and for Extension of Time to File Reply by Zdenek Bakala. Response to Motion due by 1/18/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Lightsey, Wallace)
December 5, 2018 Filing 33 RICO CASE ORDER The plaintiff shall file a RICO CASE STATEMENT within 30 days of the date of this order. Additional details within order. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 12/5/2018. (jbry, )
November 30, 2018 Filing 32 MOTION to Stay Case Until Defendant Krupa is Served by Zdenek Bakala. Response to Motion due by 12/14/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Winn, Marshall)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Response to Motion due by 12/11/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 11/26/2018.(jbry, )
November 21, 2018 Filing 30 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Zdenek Bakala. Response to Motion due by 12/5/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Winn, Marshall)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #23 Motion by Mark Bradley Sweet to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 11/14/2018.(jbry, )
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #22 Motion by Stephen Joseph Obermeier to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 11/14/2018.(jbry, )
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #21 Motion by Rebecca Jayne Fiebig to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 11/14/2018.(jbry, )
November 13, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Crowds on Demand LLC, Adam Swart. Response to Motion due by 11/27/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support, #2 Exhibit Swiss Complaint, #3 Exhibit Politico Article, #4 Envelope Bakala v. Zaoralek, #5 Exhibit Bakala Letter, #6 Exhibit KGI Rigistry Listing, #7 Exhibit Duff & Phelps Letter, #8 Exhibit Swiss Decision, #9 Exhibit Blesk.cz Article, #10 Exhibit LA Times Article, #11 Exhibit Holcman Declaration)No proposed order.(Robertson, Trudy) Modified on 11/14/2018 to edit text(jbry, ).
November 13, 2018 Filing 25 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Adam Swart.(Robertson, Trudy)
November 13, 2018 Filing 24 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Crowds on Demand LLC.(Robertson, Trudy)
November 13, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark Bradley Sweet ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8104449) by Crowds on Demand LLC, Adam Swart. Response to Motion due by 11/27/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application Affidavit Certificate Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order proposed PHV Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Robertson, Trudy)
November 13, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen Joseph Obermeier ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8104415) by Crowds on Demand LLC, Adam Swart. Response to Motion due by 11/27/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application Affidavit Certificate Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order proposed PHV Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Robertson, Trudy)
November 13, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rebecca Jayne Fiebig ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8104384) by Crowds on Demand LLC, Adam Swart. Response to Motion due by 11/27/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents Application Affidavit Certificate Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order proposed PHV Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Robertson, Trudy)
October 23, 2018 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Pavol Krupa. (jbry, )
October 17, 2018 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint served on Crowds on Demand LLC on 10/16/2018, filed by Zdenek Bakala. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service by US Mail to Crowds on Demand LLC, #2 Copy of Envelope to Crowds on Demand LLC)(Winn, Marshall)
October 17, 2018 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint served on Adam Swart on 10/16/2018, filed by Zdenek Bakala. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service by US Mail to Adam Swart, #2 Copy of Envelope to Adam Swart)(Winn, Marshall)
October 15, 2018 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint served on Crowds on Demand LLC c/o Legalzoom, Inc. Its Registered Agent on 10/12/2018, filed by Zdenek Bakala. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service by Mail of the Amended Complaint on Crowds on Demand)(Winn, Marshall)
October 15, 2018 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Amended Complaint served on Adam Swart on 10/12/2018, filed by Zdenek Bakala. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service by Mail of the Amended Complaint on Adam Swart)(Winn, Marshall)
October 11, 2018 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Crowds on Demand LLC, Pavol Krupa, Adam Swart, filed by Zdenek Bakala. Service due by 1/9/2019 (Winn, Marshall)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Margaret Haas. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 10/05/2018. (egra, )
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Andrew Schapiro. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 10/05/2018. (egra, )
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Stephen Swedlow. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 10/05/2018. (egra, )
October 4, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen Swedlow ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8038446) by Zdenek Bakala. Response to Motion due by 10/18/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application for Admission PHV of Stephen Swedlow, #2 Certificate of Good Standing for Stephen Swedlow, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Winn, Marshall)
October 4, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Andrew Schapiro ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8038438) by Zdenek Bakala. Response to Motion due by 10/18/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew Schapiro, #2 Certificate of Good Standing for Andrew Schapiro, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Winn, Marshall)
October 4, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Margaret Haas ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8038434) by Zdenek Bakala. Response to Motion due by 10/18/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Margaret Haas, #2 Certificate of Good Standing for Margaret Haas, #3 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Winn, Marshall)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zdenek Bakala. Crowds on Demand LLC served on 10/1/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service on Crowds on Demand)(Winn, Marshall)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zdenek Bakala. Adam Swart served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service on Adam Swart)(Winn, Marshall)
September 24, 2018 Filing 5 Amended Summons Issued as to Crowds on Demand LLC. (jbry, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jbry, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Zdenek Bakala.(jbry, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8014172.), filed by Zdenek Bakala. Service due by 12/20/2018(jbry, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the South Carolina District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bakala v. Krupa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crowds on Demand LLC
Represented By: Mark Bradley Sweet
Represented By: Trudy Hartzog Robertson
Represented By: Rebecca Jayne Fiebig
Represented By: Stephen Joseph Obermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pavol Krupa
Represented By: Trudy Hartzog Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Swart
Represented By: Mark Bradley Sweet
Represented By: Trudy Hartzog Robertson
Represented By: Rebecca Jayne Fiebig
Represented By: Stephen Joseph Obermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zdenek Bakala
Represented By: Wallace K Lightsey
Represented By: Marshall Winn
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Represented By: Margaret Haas
Represented By: Stephen Andrew Swedlow
Represented By: Carl Richard Hennies
Represented By: Andrew James Montgomery Bentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?